This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2021 at 10:11:43 (UTC).

Castle Apparel Limited et al v. Del Vecchio et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 Castle Apparel Limited filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Del Vecchio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04406

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAL Apparel Limited

Castle Apparel Limited

Defendants

Claudio Del Vecchio

DV Family LLC

Peak Trust Company

Delfin S.A.R.L

Matteo Del Vecchio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adrianne Katrine Jakola

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (IL)

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

James Hileman

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 N. Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher P. Malloy

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

Thomas A. Gentile

Attorney at Lampf, Lipkind, Prupis & Petigrow

One Penn Plaza, 36Th Floor

New York, NY 10119

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher P. Malloy on behalf of DV Family LLC, Claudio Del Vecchio(as Trustee of The Del Vecchio Family Trust), Claudio Del Vecchio(in his individual capacity), Matteo Del Vecchio, Delfin S.A.R.L, Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2010 Annuity Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2015 Annuity Trust)..(Malloy, Christopher) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Castle Apparel Limited, TAL Apparel Limited..(Jakola, Katie) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(jgo) (jgo). (Entered: 05/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#21) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2010 Annuity Trust) served on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/27/2021; Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV Trust) served on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/27/2021; Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2015 Annuity Trust) served on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. Document filed by TAL Apparel Limited; Castle Apparel Limited..(Jakola, Katie) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#20) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Matteo Del Vecchio served on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. Document filed by TAL Apparel Limited; Castle Apparel Limited..(Jakola, Katie) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#19) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Claudio Del Vecchio(as Trustee of The Del Vecchio Family Trust) served on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/27/2021; Claudio Del Vecchio(in his individual capacity) served on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. Document filed by TAL Apparel Limited; Castle Apparel Limited..(Jakola, Katie) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docket(#18) MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #16 Letter filed by DV Family LLC, Matteo Del Vecchio, Delfin S.A.R.L. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED., Claudio Del Vecchio Attorney Christopher P. Malloy terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/15/2021) (ama) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas A. Gentile on behalf of Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2010 Annuity Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2015 Annuity Trust)..(Gentile, Thomas) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docket(#16) LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated June 14, 2021 re: Representation of Peak Trust Company. Document filed by DV Family LLC, Claudio Del Vecchio(as Trustee of The Del Vecchio Family Trust), Claudio Del Vecchio(in his individual capacity), Matteo Del Vecchio, Delfin S.A.R.L..(Malloy, Christopher) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#15) MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #13 Letter filed by DV Family LLC, Matteo Del Vecchio, Peak Trust Company, Delfin S.A.R.L, Claudio Del Vecchio. ENDORSEMENT: All defendants have until July 27 to respond to the complaint. July 16 conference is adjourned to August 11, 2021 at 12:45 p.m. The conference will proceed telephonically. Dial-In No.: 1-888-363-4749, Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED., DV Family LLC answer due 7/27/2021; Claudio Del Vecchio(as Trustee of The Del Vecchio Family Trust) answer due 7/27/2021; Claudio Del Vecchio(in his individual capacity) answer due 7/27/2021; Matteo Del Vecchio answer due 7/27/2021; Delfin S.A.R.L answer due 7/27/2021; Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2010 Annuity Trust) answer due 7/27/2021; Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV Trust) answer due 7/27/2021; Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2015 Annuity Trust) answer due 7/27/2021.( Initial Conference set for 8/11/2021 at 12:45 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/09/2021) (ama) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#14) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Delfin S.A.R.L, Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2010 Annuity Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2015 Annuity Trust)..(Malloy, Christopher) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#13) LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated June 9, 2021 re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Document filed by DV Family LLC, Claudio Del Vecchio(as Trustee of The Del Vecchio Family Trust), Claudio Del Vecchio(in his individual capacity), Matteo Del Vecchio, Delfin S.A.R.L, Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2010 Annuity Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2015 Annuity Trust)..(Malloy, Christopher) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher P. Malloy on behalf of DV Family LLC, Claudio Del Vecchio(as Trustee of The Del Vecchio Family Trust), Claudio Del Vecchio(in his individual capacity), Matteo Del Vecchio, Delfin S.A.R.L, Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2010 Annuity Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2015 Annuity Trust)..(Malloy, Christopher) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for James R.P. Hileman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24561986. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for James R.P. Hileman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24561986. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Castle Apparel Limited, TAL Apparel Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Hileman, James) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to DV Family LLC, Claudio Del Vecchio(as Trustee of The Del Vecchio Family Trust), Claudio Del Vecchio(in his individual capacity), Matteo Del Vecchio, Delfin S.A.R.L, Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2010 Annuity Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2015 Annuity Trust), TAL Apparel Limited..(gp) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Castle Apparel Limited, TAL Apparel Limited..(Jakola, Katie) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket(#3) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nmo) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketORDER REDACTING PLEADING FILED IN 21-MC-441. Document filed by Castle Apparel Limited, TAL Apparel Limited..(jgo) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(jgo) (jgo). (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DV Family LLC, Claudio Del Vecchio(as Trustee of The Del Vecchio Family Trust), Claudio Del Vecchio(in his individual capacity), Matteo Del Vecchio, Delfin S.A.R.L, Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2010 Annuity Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV Trust), Peak Trust Company(as Trustee of The CDV 2015 Annuity Trust). (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 465401279587)Document filed by TAL Apparel Limited, Castle Apparel Limited..(jgo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2021: #1 Exhibit Stockholders Agreement) (jgo). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/17/2021) (jgo). (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adrianne Katrine Jakola(Designation Retained)