This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/02/2020 at 08:46:51 (UTC).

Castillo v. Gama Aviation, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 Castillo filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Gama Aviation, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey A. Meyer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00454

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey A. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephanie Castillo

Defendant

Gama Aviation, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew D. Paradisi

Attorney at Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP

364 Franklin Avenue

Hartford, CT 06114

Emanuele Robert Cicchiello

Attorney at Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP

364 Franklin Avenue

Hartford, CT 06114

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Lynn Vizvary

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

90 State House Square, 8Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

David R. Jimenez

Attorney at Jackson Lewis - P.C. Htfd, CT

90 State House Sq., 8Th Fl.

Hartford, CT 06103-3708

 

Court Documents

#17

15 #4

Exhibit Defendant's Registration with State of New Jersey

15 #3

Exhibit Defendant Blog Post Re: Shelton, CT Headquarters

15 #2

Exhibit Annual Report of Gama Aviation LLC to Connecticut Secretary of State

15 #1

Exhibit Served Complaint

#15

#14

12 #1

Standing Order on Removed Cases

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCase remanded to State Court Judicial District of New Haven(and not to Hartford as previously indicated in error.) (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket(#19) ORDER: This matter shall be remanded to Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of New Haven of where venue is proper. As indicated previously, because this remand is by consent, the Clerk of Court shall forthwith remand this action to state court without the usual waiting period of D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 83.7. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/28/20.(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCase remanded to State Court Judicial District of Hartford. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketJUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Freberg, B) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docket(#18) ORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION TO REMAND (Doc. #17). The Court GRANTS the consent motion to remand to the Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of Hartford. Because this remand is by consent, the Clerk of Court shall forthwith remand this action to state court without the usual waiting period of D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 83.7, and the Clerk of Court shall close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/16/2020. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gama Aviation, LLC.Responses due by 5/6/2020 (Jimenez, David) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docket(#16) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff has filed this action against Gama Aviation, LLC, an entity that appears from its names to be a limited liability company. The citizenship of a limited liability company is determined on the basis of the citizenship of each one of its members, not by its place of incorporation and principal place of business. See, e.g., Platinum-Montaur Life Scis., LLC v. Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., 943 F.3d 613, 615 (2d Cir. 2019). Both parties' submissions to date proceed on the basis of the mistaken assumption that the citizenship of the defendant should be determined by reference simply to the place of incorporation and principal place of business. Doc. #1 at 2 (notice of removal); Doc. #15 at 2-3 (memorandum in support of motion to remand). Counsel shall consult with one another by April 13, 2020, with respect to whether this action is indeed properly removable to federal court. If defendant agrees that it is not, then defendant shall forthwith file a motion to remand on or before April 15, 2020. If defendant continues to believe that there is federal jurisdiction over this action, then plaintiff may file a renewed motion to remand and request for attorney's fees if warranted by April 17, 2020, and defendant shall file any response by April 24, 2020. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/9/2020. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions by Stephanie Castillo.Responses due by 4/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Complaint, #2 Exhibit Annual Report of Gama Aviation LLC to Connecticut Secretary of State, #3 Exhibit Defendant Blog Post Re: Shelton, CT Headquarters, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Registration with State of New Jersey)(Paradisi, Matthew) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Stephanie Castillo (Cicchiello, Emanuele) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Gama Aviation, LLC to 5/1/2020. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2020; Discovery due by 10/3/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 11/7/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/3/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketJudge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gama Aviation, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wheels UP for Gama Aviation, LLC. (Jimenez, David) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time until May 1, 2020 In Which to Respond to Complaint by Gama Aviation, LLC. (Jimenez, David) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Vizvary on behalf of Gama Aviation, LLC (Vizvary, Jessica) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Jimenez on behalf of Gama Aviation, LLC (Jimenez, David) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Gama Aviation, LLC Re Statement Regarding Removal (Jimenez, David) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Gama Aviation, LLC Re Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jimenez, David) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Gama Aviation, LLC Regarding Pending Motions (Jimenez, David) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gama Aviation, LLC from Superior Court, J.D. of Hartford at Hartford, case number NNH-20-cv-6102012-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5784526, filed by Gama Aviation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jimenez, David) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAMA AVIATION ENGINEERING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David R. Jimenez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Lynn Vizvary