This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:46:12 (UTC).

Castillo v. Barr et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Castillo filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip R. Lammens and William F. Jung. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00619

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

Presiding Judge

William F. Jung

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Castillo

Coleman, FL 33521

Defendants

Gary Venuto

FNU Johnson

Lloyd Pearsall

William Barr

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER Plaintiff to show cause within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS to this Court why he should not be subject to sanctions, including, but not limited to, the dismissal of the instant case without prejudice due to his failure to honestly apprise this Court of his litigation history. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/29/2020. (CRR) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#5

(#5) CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Juan Castillo. (Signed only by plaintiff) (LAB) Modified on 12/16/2019 (LAB). (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Juan Castillo. Related case(s): yes. (LAB) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/9/2019. (SAO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

2 #1

Attachment

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(RLK) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Order to Show Cause for an Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining O

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against William Barr, FNU Johnson, Lloyd Pearsall, Gary Venuto with Jury Demand filed by Juan Castillo. (no fees paid, no service copies provided) (Attachments: #1 Order to Show Cause for an Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order Against Retalliation)(RLK) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Plaintiff to show cause within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS to this Court why he should not be subject to sanctions, including, but not limited to, the dismissal of the instant case without prejudice due to his failure to honestly apprise this Court of his litigation history. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/29/2020. (CRR) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketFEES paid by Juan Castillo (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number OCA-10850). (RLK) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Juan Castillo. (Signed only by plaintiff) (LAB) Modified on 12/16/2019 (LAB). (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Juan Castillo. Related case(s): yes. (LAB) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/9/2019. (SAO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(RLK) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against William Barr, FNU Johnson, Lloyd Pearsall, Gary Venuto with Jury Demand filed by Juan Castillo. (no fees paid, no service copies provided) (Attachments: #1 Order to Show Cause for an Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order Against Retalliation)(RLK) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less