This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2021 at 09:13:37 (UTC).

Castilla Roofing, Inc. A/A/O John Cuckler and Marjorie Cuckler v. Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Castilla Roofing, Inc A/A/O John Cuckler and Marjorie Cuckler filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Indian Harbor Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Polster Chappell and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00200

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheri Polster Chappell

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Castilla Roofing, Inc. A/A/O John Cuckler and Marjorie Cuckler

Defendant

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea M Franklin

Attorney at The Whisler Law Firm

1909 Tyler St., Suite 501, Ste 501

Hollywood, FL 33068

Joshua Aaron Whisler

Attorney at The Whisler Law Firm, P.A.

1909 Tyler Street

Hollywood, FL 33020

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Travis

Attorney at Clausen Miller P.C.

4830 W. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33609

Joseph Paxton

Attorney at Clausen Miller PC

8011 Sequester Loop

Land O Lakes, FL 34637

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#11

#10

#9

#7

#6

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

State Court Other Documents

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of compliance with Court Order by Castilla Roofing, Inc. A/A/O John Cuckler and Marjorie Cuckler (Whisler, Joshua) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Travis, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE to counsel Andrea M. Franklin of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration through PACER. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appereance Appearance by Joshua Aaron Whisler on behalf of Castilla Roofing, Inc. A/A/O John Cuckler and Marjorie Cuckler (Whisler, Joshua) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GOVERNING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/23/2021. (jmc) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GOVERNING TELEPHONIC PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/23/2021. (jmc) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 4/26/2021. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Travis, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/11/2021. (RMT) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMT) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Indian Harbor Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Castilla Roofing, Inc. A/A/O John Cuckler and Marjorie Cuckler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(RMT) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0200-SPC-MRM. (SJB) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Indian Harbor Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America, Inc., Corporate Parent AXA S.A., Corporate Parent XL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent XLIT Ltd., Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd., Corporate Parent XL Financial Holdings (Ireland) Limited, Corporate Parent EXEL Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent XL Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent X.L. America Inc. for Indian Harbor Insurance Company.. (Travis, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twentieth Judicial Circuit, case number 11-2021-CA-000440-0001-XX filed in State Court on 2/12/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17983078 filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Travis, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Castilla Roofing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Paxton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Travis