This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/03/2021 at 18:59:15 (UTC).

Castenada v. Walmart et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 Castenada filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Nuffer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00116

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Nuffer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Canyon Castenada

Defendants

Kurt Harbin

Walmart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua P. Berrett

Attorney at BIGHORN LAW

716 S Jones Blvd

Las Vegas, NV 89107

Defendant Attorneys

Marianne Schumann

Attorney at MORGAN MINNOCK RICE & MINER

136 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Andrea M. Keysar

Attorney at MORGAN MINNOCK RICE & MINER

136 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Mitchel T. Rice

Attorney at MORGAN MINNOCK RICE & MINER

136 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

11 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A Proposed First Amended Complaint

#11

#10

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

#7

#5

#4

2 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #3

Exhibit NOR_Exhibit C

2 #2

Exhibit NOR_Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit NOR_Exhibit A

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Canyon Castenada. (Berrett, Joshua) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Walmart. (Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Canyon Castenada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Berrett, Joshua) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2021. Expert Discovery due by 2/28/2022. Motions due by 3/23/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2022 at 08:30 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. 4-Day Jury Trial set for 8/16/2022 at 08:15 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/20/20 (alt) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#9) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Nuffer: Case Management & Scheduling Conference held on 11/20/2020. Counsel, court and court reporter present by Zoom video conference. Discussion heard on the allegations stated in the complaint and current scheduling order. Court adjourned. Attorney for Plaintiff: Joshua Berrett, Attorney for Defendant: Marianne Schumann. Court Reporter: Kelly Sommerville.(Time Start: 1:28, Time End: 1:55, Room 2B St. George.)(pjd) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER to Prepare Schedule and Prepare for Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 11/2/20. (dla) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF HEARING: Case Management Conference and Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 01:30 PM By Zoom video conference before Judge David Nuffer. The Attorney Planning Meeting Report must be filed and the Proposed Scheduling Order must be emailed in word processing format to dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov at least one week before the Conference.Conference link emailed to counsel and court reporter by Outlook calendar invitation. Counsel may share the link with clients wishing to participate. All others (media, public, etc) may email dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov to obtain conference information (pjd) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Canyon Castenada, Defendants Kurt Harbin, Walmart. (jwt) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) filed by Kurt Harbin, Walmart. (Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT:This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 5th District Court Iron County, case number 200500148, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3763035) filed by Walmart, Kurt Harbin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NOR_Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit NOR_Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit NOR_Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Defendants Kurt Harbin, Walmart is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (jwt) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua P Berrett