This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:52:01 (UTC).

Castanon et al v. WinCo Holdings, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Castanon filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WinCo Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Morrison C. England, Jr, Edmund F. Brennan and Jeremy D. Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01656

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Morrison C. England, Jr

Referral Judges

Edmund F. Brennan

Jeremy D. Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Esmeralda Castanon

John Duron

Defendants

WinCo Holdings, Inc.

WinCo Holdings, Inc. An Idaho Corporation Doing business as Winco Foods

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Ross Hawkins

Attorney at James Hawkins APLC

9880 Research Drive, Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

Christina M. Lucio

Attorney at Farnaes & Lucio, APC

2235 Encinitas Blvd., Suite 210

Encinitas, CA 92024

Defendant Attorney

Sophia Kwan

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2350

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) OPPOSITION by Esmeralda Castanon to #8 Motion to Dismiss,. (Hawkins, James) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Edmund F. Brennan* to *Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* for all further proceedings. As of October 1, 2020, Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is reassigned to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California. (Reader, L) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Memorandum

#8

(#8) MOTION to DISMISS by WinCo Holdings, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum , #2 Proposed Order )(Kwan, Sophia) Modified on 9/30/2020 (Tupolo, A). Mo (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#7

(#7) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against WinCo Holdings, Inc. by Esmeralda Castanon, John Duron. (Hawkins, James) Modified on 9/15/2020 (Huang, H). (Entered: 09/14/2020)

5 #1

Memorandum

#5

(#5) MOTION to DISMISS, MOTION to STRIKE by WinCo Holdings, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Kwan, Sophia) Modified on 8/25/2020 (Reader, L). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

3 #2

VDRP

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant WinCo Holdings, Inc.. (Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

1 #2

Declaration of Renae Gaskill

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) OPPOSITION by Esmeralda Castanon to #8 Motion to Dismiss,. (Hawkins, James) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Edmund F. Brennan* to *Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* for all further proceedings. As of October 1, 2020, Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is reassigned to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California. (Reader, L) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 10/29/2020 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #8 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to DISMISS by WinCo Holdings, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum , #2 Proposed Order )(Kwan, Sophia) Modified on 9/30/2020 (Tupolo, A). Mo (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against WinCo Holdings, Inc. by Esmeralda Castanon, John Duron. (Hawkins, James) Modified on 9/15/2020 (Huang, H). (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #5 is noticed for an unavailable hearing date. Accordingly, and on the Courts own motion, the 9/24/2020 motion hearing is VACATED and RESET on 10/1/2020 and is also SUBMITTED pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the 10/1/2020 motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. For future filings, counsel is directed to find available civil law and motion calendar dates on the Court's website at www.caed.uscourts.gov by following these menu items: Judges, All Judges, United States District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (MCE), Standard Information (under the Case Management Procedures). Reservation of a hearing date is not required and all civil motions are at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to DISMISS, MOTION to STRIKE by WinCo Holdings, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Kwan, Sophia) Modified on 8/25/2020 (Reader, L). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by WinCo Holdings, Inc. re #3 Civil New Case Documents for MCE, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT number 0972-9059467, Kwan, Sophia 2020-08-17 18:05:45 Notice of Removal (2:20-at-00818) CreditCard 0972-9059467 $ 400.00. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant WinCo Holdings, Inc.. (Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior, case number 34-2020-00278994 by WinCo Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Renae Gaskill)(Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less