This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:36:00 (UTC).

Cassandra Ross-Aragon v. BMW of North America LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Cassandra Ross-Aragon filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02369

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cassandra Ross-Aragon

Defendants

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

BMW of North America LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Michael Lovasz

Attorney at Consumer Legal Services PC

2330 Long Beach Boulevard

Long Beach, CA 90806

Jeeho Henberwithz Lim

Attorney at Consumer Legal Services PC

2330 Long Beach Boulevard

Long Beach, CA 90806

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Kenneth Dixon

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP

402 West Broadway Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Olivia J W Miner

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP

402 West Broadway Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Vickie E Turner

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP

402 West Broadway Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2020 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp. (Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#9

(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit Decl. Ex. C BMW NA Answer

#5

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Jury Demand #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 served on 12/05/2019. (Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit Decl. Ex. D - Leasing Agreement

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2019-01109054 Receipt No: 0973-24903549 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Decl. Ex. A Complaint, #3 Exhibit Decl. Ex. B Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Decl. Ex. C BMW NA Answer, #5 Exhibit Decl. Ex. D - Leasing Agreement, #6 Exhibit Decl. Ex. E - All Pleadings) (Attorney Robert Kenneth Dixon added to party BMW of North America LLC(pty:dft))(Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit Decl. Ex. E - All Pleadings

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit Decl. Ex. B Summons and Complaint

#11

(#11) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 6 days, filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC.. (Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #1

Declaration

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC. (Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC.. (Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Decl. Ex. A Complaint

#6

(#6) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:19-cv-02369-DOC-DFMx. (car) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 6 days, filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC.. (Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2020 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:19-cv-02369-DOC-DFMx. (car) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC. Filed in state Court on 12/5/2019 Submitted with Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants BMW of North America LLC, Does 1 through 20, inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Cassandra Ross-Aragon. Filed in state Court on 11/10/19 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Jury Demand #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 served on 12/05/2019. (Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp. (Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC.. (Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC. (Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2019-01109054 Receipt No: 0973-24903549 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BMW of North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Decl. Ex. A Complaint, #3 Exhibit Decl. Ex. B Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Decl. Ex. C BMW NA Answer, #5 Exhibit Decl. Ex. D - Leasing Agreement, #6 Exhibit Decl. Ex. E - All Pleadings) (Attorney Robert Kenneth Dixon added to party BMW of North America LLC(pty:dft))(Dixon, Robert) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.