This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2021 at 08:50:53 (UTC).

Caspiana Interests L L C et al v. Chesapeake Louisiana L P et al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Caspiana Interests L L C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Chesapeake Louisiana L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa D Gilmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01061

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa D Gilmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Caspiana Interests L L C

Elizabeth McClellan Turner

Defendants

Chesapeake Louisiana LP

Chesapeake Operating LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John M Madison, Jr

Attorney at Wiener Weiss & Madison

P O Box 21990

Shreveport, LA 71120-1990

Patrick Lawrence McCune

Attorney at Wiener, Weiss & Madison

445 Louisiana Ave.

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Reid Allen Jones

Attorney at Wiener Weiss & Madison

P O Box 21990

Shreveport, LA 71120-1990

R Joseph Naus

Attorney at Weiner Weiss Madison

333 Texas St, Ste 2350

Shreveport, LA 71101

Anna W O'Neal

Attorney at Wiener Weiss & Madison

P O Box 21990

Shreveport, LA 71120-1990

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Katherine Casey

Attorney at Baker Donelson et al (NO)

201 St Charles Ave Ste 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Kenneth Marc Klemm

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

201 St. Charles Avenue, 36Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

Tessa Pousson Vorhaben

Attorney at Baker Donelson et al.

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#53

#52

51 #2

Proposed Order

51 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#51

#50

#49

48 #1

*Restricted*

#48

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Record

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER granting #51 Ex Parte Motion to Refer Case to the Bankruptcy Court. It is ORDERED that this action is hereby referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Caspiana Interests L L C, Elizabeth McClellan Turner, filed.(McCune, Patrick) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Unopposed MOTION Ex Parte, Unopposed Motion to Refer Case to The United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas by Caspiana Interests L L C, Elizabeth McClellan Turner, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(McCune, Patrick) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Chesapeake Louisiana LP, Chesapeake Operating LLC, filed.(Klemm, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Case transferred in from Louisiana Western. Case Number 5:19-cv-00489; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from Western District of Louisiana to Southern District of Texas. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER granting #45 Motion to Transfer Case and that venue is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/31/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: In light of the Motion to Transfer Venue #45 , the telephone status conference originally set for 4/1/21 is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/31/2021. (crt,Rider, M) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #45 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/30/2021. (crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Chesapeake Louisiana L P, Chesapeake Operating L L C . (aty,Klemm, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 5/30/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 6/6/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 6/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/29/2019. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Chesapeake Louisiana L P, Chesapeake Operating L L C.(aty,Vorhaben, Tessa) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/22/2019. (crt,Stephens, M) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/18/2019. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chesapeake Louisiana, L.P. identifying Other Affiliate Chesapeake Energy Corporation, Other Affiliate Chesapeake Operating, LLC, Other Affiliate Chesapeake Energy Louisiana Corporation for Chesapeake Louisiana, L.P.. (aty,Vorhaben, Tessa) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Chesapeake Energy Corporation for Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.. (aty,Vorhaben, Tessa) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number C 00615315-A (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3927182) filed by Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C., Chesapeake Louisiana, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Record)(Attorney Tessa Pousson Vorhaben added to party Chesapeake Louisiana, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Tessa Pousson Vorhaben added to party Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(aty,Vorhaben, Tessa) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chesapeake Louisiana, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Chesapeak Operating LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tessa Pousson Vorhaben

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Katherine Casey