This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2020 at 11:38:58 (UTC).

Cason v. EOG Resources, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 Cason filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against EOG Resources, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02189

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas D. Cason

Defendant

EOG Resources, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Wells Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3050

Houston, TX 77046

William Richard Liles

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Michael A Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorney

Michael Carter Crow

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney St, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010-3095

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by EOG Resources, Inc., filed.(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by EOG Resources, Inc., filed.(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Thomas D. Cason, filed.(Liles, William) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to EOG Resources, Inc. served on 6/24/2020, answer due 7/15/2020, filed.(Liles, William) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to EOG Resources, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Thomas D. Cason, filed. (Liles, William) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Thomas D. Cason, filed. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to EOG Resources, Inc., filed.(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Consent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against EOG Resources, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24831130) filed by Thomas D. Cason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by EOG Resources, Inc., filed.(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by EOG Resources, Inc., filed.(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Thomas D. Cason, filed.(Liles, William) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to EOG Resources, Inc. served on 6/24/2020, answer due 7/15/2020, filed.(Liles, William) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to EOG Resources, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Thomas D. Cason, filed. (Liles, William) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Thomas D. Cason, filed. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to EOG Resources, Inc., filed.(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EOG Resources, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24831130) filed by Thomas D. Cason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EOG Resources Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William R. Liles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew W. Dunlap

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A. Josephson