This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2023 at 07:40:29 (UTC).

Casio Computer Co., Ltd. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 Casio Computer Co , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Kness. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00978

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Kness

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Casio Computer Co., Ltd.

Defendant

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

Michael A. Hierl

 

Court Documents

#23

RESTRICTED

#22

(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 , motion for leave to file excess pages #9 , and ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order and other relief #10 are granted in part. Plaintiff's submissions establish that, were Defendants to learn of these proceedings before the execution of Plaintiff's requested preliminary injunctive relief, there is a significant risk that Defendants could destroy relevant documentary evidence and hide or transfer assets beyond the reach of the Court. Accordingly, subject to unsealing at an appropriate time, Plaintiff may for now file under seal the documents identified in the motion to seal and appearing at docket entries #7 and #12 through #18 . The accompanying Temporary Restraining Order shall also be placed under seal. In addition, for the purpose of the motions cited above, Plaintiff's filings support proceeding (for the time being) on an ex parte basis. Specifically, and as noted above, were defendants to be informed of this proceeding before a TRO could issue, it is likely assets and websites would be redirected, thus defeating Plaintiff's interests in identifying defendants, stopping Defendants' infringing conduct, and obtaining an accounting. In addition, the evidence submitted by Plaintiff shows a likelihood of success on the merits (including evidence of active infringement and sales into Illinois), that the harm to Plaintiff is irreparable, and that an injunction is in the public interest. An injunction serves the public interest because of the consumer confusion caused by counterfeit goods, and there is no countervailing harm to defendants from an order directing them to stop infringement. Electronic service of process does not violate any treaty and is consistent with due process because it effectively communicates the pendency of this action to Defendants. As other judges in this District have noted, there may be reason to question both the propriety of the joinder of all Defendants in this one action and whether Plaintiff will pursue an accounting (which Plaintiff asserts as justification for an asset freeze), but at this preliminary stage, the court is persuaded that Plaintiff has provided sufficient evidence of coordinated activity and the prospect of an accounting to justify the requested relief as to all Defendants. A transfer of domain names is appropriate to prevent infringing conduct. Expedited discovery is warranted to identify defendants and to implement the asset freeze. If any defendant appears and objects, the court will revisit the asset freeze and joinder. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#21

(#21) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#20

(#20) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#19

(#19) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#18

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#10

(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 , motion for leave to file excess pages #9 , and ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order and other relief #10 are granted in part. Plaintiff's submissions establish that, were Defendants to learn of these proceedings before the execution of Plaintiff's requested preliminary injunctive relief, there is a significant risk that Defendants could destroy relevant documentary evidence and hide or transfer assets beyond the reach of the Court. Accordingly, subject to unsealing at an appropriate time, Plaintiff may for now file under seal the documents identified in the motion to seal and appearing at docket entries #7 and #12 through #18 . The accompanying Temporary Restraining Order shall also be placed under seal. In addition, for the purpose of the motions cited above, Plaintiff's filings support proceeding (for the time being) on an ex parte basis. Specifically, and as noted above, were defendants to be informed of this proceeding before a TRO could issue, it is likely assets and websites would be redirected, thus defeating Plaintiff's interests in identifying defendants, stopping Defendants' infringing conduct, and obtaining an accounting. In addition, the evidence submitted by Plaintiff shows a likelihood of success on the merits (including evidence of active infringement and sales into Illinois), that the harm to Plaintiff is irreparable, and that an injunction is in the public interest. An injunction serves the public interest because of the consumer confusion caused by counterfeit goods, and there is no countervailing harm to defendants from an order directing them to stop infringement. Electronic service of process does not violate any treaty and is consistent with due process because it effectively communicates the pendency of this action to Defendants. As other judges in this District have noted, there may be reason to question both the propriety of the joinder of all Defendants in this one action and whether Plaintiff will pursue an accounting (which Plaintiff asserts as justification for an asset freeze), but at this preliminary stage, the court is persuaded that Plaintiff has provided sufficient evidence of coordinated activity and the prospect of an accounting to justify the requested relief as to all Defendants. A transfer of domain names is appropriate to prevent infringing conduct. Expedited discovery is warranted to identify defendants and to implement the asset freeze. If any defendant appears and objects, the court will revisit the asset freeze and joinder. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#9

(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 , motion for leave to file excess pages #9 , and ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order and other relief #10 are granted in part. Plaintiff's submissions establish that, were Defendants to learn of these proceedings before the execution of Plaintiff's requested preliminary injunctive relief, there is a significant risk that Defendants could destroy relevant documentary evidence and hide or transfer assets beyond the reach of the Court. Accordingly, subject to unsealing at an appropriate time, Plaintiff may for now file under seal the documents identified in the motion to seal and appearing at docket entries #7 and #12 through #18 . The accompanying Temporary Restraining Order shall also be placed under seal. In addition, for the purpose of the motions cited above, Plaintiff's filings support proceeding (for the time being) on an ex parte basis. Specifically, and as noted above, were defendants to be informed of this proceeding before a TRO could issue, it is likely assets and websites would be redirected, thus defeating Plaintiff's interests in identifying defendants, stopping Defendants' infringing conduct, and obtaining an accounting. In addition, the evidence submitted by Plaintiff shows a likelihood of success on the merits (including evidence of active infringement and sales into Illinois), that the harm to Plaintiff is irreparable, and that an injunction is in the public interest. An injunction serves the public interest because of the consumer confusion caused by counterfeit goods, and there is no countervailing harm to defendants from an order directing them to stop infringement. Electronic service of process does not violate any treaty and is consistent with due process because it effectively communicates the pendency of this action to Defendants. As other judges in this District have noted, there may be reason to question both the propriety of the joinder of all Defendants in this one action and whether Plaintiff will pursue an accounting (which Plaintiff asserts as justification for an asset freeze), but at this preliminary stage, the court is persuaded that Plaintiff has provided sufficient evidence of coordinated activity and the prospect of an accounting to justify the requested relief as to all Defendants. A transfer of domain names is appropriate to prevent infringing conduct. Expedited discovery is warranted to identify defendants and to implement the asset freeze. If any defendant appears and objects, the court will revisit the asset freeze and joinder. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 , motion for leave to file excess pages #9 , and ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order and other relief #10 are granted in part. Plaintiff's submissions establish that, were Defendants to learn of these proceedings before the execution of Plaintiff's requested preliminary injunctive relief, there is a significant risk that Defendants could destroy relevant documentary evidence and hide or transfer assets beyond the reach of the Court. Accordingly, subject to unsealing at an appropriate time, Plaintiff may for now file under seal the documents identified in the motion to seal and appearing at docket entries #7 and #12 through #18 . The accompanying Temporary Restraining Order shall also be placed under seal. In addition, for the purpose of the motions cited above, Plaintiff's filings support proceeding (for the time being) on an ex parte basis. Specifically, and as noted above, were defendants to be informed of this proceeding before a TRO could issue, it is likely assets and websites would be redirected, thus defeating Plaintiff's interests in identifying defendants, stopping Defendants' infringing conduct, and obtaining an accounting. In addition, the evidence submitted by Plaintiff shows a likelihood of success on the merits (including evidence of active infringement and sales into Illinois), that the harm to Plaintiff is irreparable, and that an injunction is in the public interest. An injunction serves the public interest because of the consumer confusion caused by counterfeit goods, and there is no countervailing harm to defendants from an order directing them to stop infringement. Electronic service of process does not violate any treaty and is consistent with due process because it effectively communicates the pendency of this action to Defendants. As other judges in this District have noted, there may be reason to question both the propriety of the joinder of all Defendants in this one action and whether Plaintiff will pursue an accounting (which Plaintiff asserts as justification for an asset freeze), but at this preliminary stage, the court is persuaded that Plaintiff has provided sufficient evidence of coordinated activity and the prospect of an accounting to justify the requested relief as to all Defendants. A transfer of domain names is appropriate to prevent infringing conduct. Expedited discovery is warranted to identify defendants and to implement the asset freeze. If any defendant appears and objects, the court will revisit the asset freeze and joinder. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

1 #2

Exhibit Group Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit Group Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 4/14/2023 (td, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 , motion for leave to file excess pages #9 , and ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order and other relief #10 are granted in part. Plaintiff's submissions establish that, were Defendants to learn of these proceedings before the execution of Plaintiff's requested preliminary injunctive relief, there is a significant risk that Defendants could destroy relevant documentary evidence and hide or transfer assets beyond the reach of the Court. Accordingly, subject to unsealing at an appropriate time, Plaintiff may for now file under seal the documents identified in the motion to seal and appearing at docket entries #7 and #12 through #18 . The accompanying Temporary Restraining Order shall also be placed under seal. In addition, for the purpose of the motions cited above, Plaintiff's filings support proceeding (for the time being) on an ex parte basis. Specifically, and as noted above, were defendants to be informed of this proceeding before a TRO could issue, it is likely assets and websites would be redirected, thus defeating Plaintiff's interests in identifying defendants, stopping Defendants' infringing conduct, and obtaining an accounting. In addition, the evidence submitted by Plaintiff shows a likelihood of success on the merits (including evidence of active infringement and sales into Illinois), that the harm to Plaintiff is irreparable, and that an injunction is in the public interest. An injunction serves the public interest because of the consumer confusion caused by counterfeit goods, and there is no countervailing harm to defendants from an order directing them to stop infringement. Electronic service of process does not violate any treaty and is consistent with due process because it effectively communicates the pendency of this action to Defendants. As other judges in this District have noted, there may be reason to question both the propriety of the joinder of all Defendants in this one action and whether Plaintiff will pursue an accounting (which Plaintiff asserts as justification for an asset freeze), but at this preliminary stage, the court is persuaded that Plaintiff has provided sufficient evidence of coordinated activity and the prospect of an accounting to justify the requested relief as to all Defendants. A transfer of domain names is appropriate to prevent infringing conduct. Expedited discovery is warranted to identify defendants and to implement the asset freeze. If any defendant appears and objects, the court will revisit the asset freeze and joinder. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Exhibit 3 Part 7 of Kiuchi Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Exhibit 3 Part 6 of Kiuchi Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Exhibit 3 Part 5 of Kiuchi Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Exhibit 3 Part 4 of Kiuchi Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Exhibit 3 Part 3 of Kiuchi Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, ) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, ) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Casio Computer Co., Ltd.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20358227. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Group Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less