This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/15/2023 at 08:50:54 (UTC).

Casio Computer Co., Ltd. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 Casio Computer Co , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00895

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Casio Computer Co., Ltd.

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Ningbo Puning Electronic Technology Co., Ltd.

Bolly computer digital Store

Digital Global Accessories Store

UE China Store

UKE Store

wellcomshop Store

wisefield

YIKU Store

yunzhijia Store

ZZshop

afurdel

dilshan_athukorala

sfoxlis

shamihi_79

sujeestore

90 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Hierl

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

 

Court Documents

#48

(#48) PRELIMINARY Injunction Order. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/14/2023. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#47

(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held on 4/14/2023. No one appeared on behalf of defendants. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Nos. 1-9, 29-52 and 95-104 #41 is granted. A telephone status hearing is set for 5/25/2023 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#46

(#46) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 11 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#45

(#45) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 4/5/2023, answer due 4/26/2023. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#44

(#44) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The telephone status hearing set for 4/14/2023 at 9:00 a.m. is converted to a telephone hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction #41 . The same dial-in information shall apply. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#43

(#43) DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #41 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#42

(#42) MEMORANDUM by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #41 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#41

(#41) MOTION by Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Nos. 1-9, 29-52 and 95-104 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#40

(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 13, 14 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) PRELIMINARY Injunction Order. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/14/2023. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion hearing held on 4/14/2023. No one appeared on behalf of defendants. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Nos. 1-9, 29-52 and 95-104 #41 is granted. A telephone status hearing is set for 5/25/2023 at 9:00 a.m. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 11 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 4/5/2023, answer due 4/26/2023. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The telephone status hearing set for 4/14/2023 at 9:00 a.m. is converted to a telephone hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction #41 . The same dial-in information shall apply. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #41 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MEMORANDUM by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #41 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION by Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Nos. 1-9, 29-52 and 95-104 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 13, 14 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 18 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, ) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, ) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Casio Computer Co., Ltd. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) Modified on 3/16/2023 (daj, ). (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Casio Computer Co., Ltd. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Casio Computer Co., Ltd.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20345474. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less