This case was last updated from PACER on 04/30/2019 at 07:31:58 (UTC).

Cash v. Columbia Sussex Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 Cash filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Columbia Sussex Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lawrence J. Vilardo and Hugh B. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00278

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. Vilardo

Referral Judge

Hugh B. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth Cash

Defendants

JOHN DOE

Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott

Columbia Sussex Corporation

. John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tiffany Marie Kopacz

Attorney at Chiacchia & Fleming, LLP

5113 South Park Avenue

Hamburg, NY 14075

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan Justin Greystone

Attorney at Spector Gadon & Rosen, P.C.

1635 Market Street, 7Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A and B

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Erie, case number 800262/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3376443), filed by Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Certificate of Service)(Greystone, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint Together with Affirmative Defenses by Columbia Sussex Corporation.(Greystone, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Columbia Sussex Corporation. (Greystone, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott. to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Coversheet filed by Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott. (Greystone, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

1 #2

Certificate of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • (#6) ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTTEXT ORDERJoint Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/20/2019. Upon receipt, this Court will determine whether to accept the proposed Scheduling Order deadlines or set a Scheduling Conference.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 4/11/2019. (DRH) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • (#5) TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Hugh B. Scott, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/10/2019. (CMD) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Columbia Sussex Corporation. (Greystone, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint Together with Affirmative Defenses by Columbia Sussex Corporation.(Greystone, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott. to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Coversheet filed by Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott. (Greystone, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Erie, case number 800262/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3376443), filed by Columbia Sussex Corporation d/b/a Albany Marriott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Certificate of Service)(Greystone, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.