This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:41:34 (UTC).

Casey v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Casey filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00958

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theresa I Casey

Defendants

Wright Medical Technology Inc

Does named as John Does IX; Jane Does IX; ABC Corporation I-X; Def Limited Liability Company I-X; and XYZ Partnership or LLP, I-X

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy James Casey

Attorney at Schmitt Schneck Casey Even & Williams PC

1221 E Osborn Road, Suite 105

Phoenix, AZ 85014-5540

Defendant Attorneys

Claire Martha Hillman

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Janet L. Hickson

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1600

Irvine, CA 92614-2546

Scott W. Sayler

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Donn Christopher Alexander

Attorney at Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC

40 N Central Avenue, Suite 2700

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Dana J. Ash

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

30 South 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-4196

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Dana J. Ash on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#30

(#30) ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

28 #1

*Restricted*

#28

(#28) Case electronically transferred in from U.S. District Court, District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-05360. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#27

(#27) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER - Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Arkansas Re MDL-2949. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Theresa I Casey. (Casey, Timothy) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 06/08/2020)

24 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

24 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17502309. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5360-PHX-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Alexander, Donn) (ARC) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-012809. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17502309 filed by Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Alexander, Donn) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(ARC) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Dana J. Ash on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docket(#29) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Casey v. Wright Medical Technology Incorporated et al, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the USDC Arizona and assigned case number 2:19-cv-05360, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-00958-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. All counsel should request E-File Registration with the Eastern District of Arkansas through PACER. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/19/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Case electronically transferred in from U.S. District Court, District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-05360. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketRemark: Case Transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER - Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Arkansas Re MDL-2949. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Theresa I Casey. (Casey, Timothy) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER: The Court does not prejudge that an MDL motion will be granted. The case schedule does not have any proximate deadlines. Moreover, no discovery that might be done in this case will be wasted. It will all be needed eventually. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the joint Stipulation to Stay (Doc. #24 ) is denied. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, vg) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Motion to Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Alexander, Donn) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Scott W. Sayler by Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing)(Sayler, Scott) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Amended Complaint filed by Theresa I Casey. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology Incorporated filed by Theresa I Casey. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3)(Casey, Timothy) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER - Motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon any Defendant who has not yet appeared and file notice of service. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 10/10/2019. (RMV) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Wright Medical Group Incorporated. (ARC) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17502309. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5360-PHX-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Docket***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Wright Medical Technology Incorporated, Wright Medical Group Incorporated on 9/19/2019.(original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 9/23/2019) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Alexander, Donn) (ARC) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-012809. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17502309 filed by Wright Medical Technology Incorporated. (Alexander, Donn) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(ARC) [Transferred from azd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janet L Hickson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dana J. Ash

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donn Alexander