This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2019 at 07:40:27 (UTC).

Casey v. Middlebrooks

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Casey filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Middlebrooks. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Halil S. Ozerden and John C. Gargiulo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00718

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Halil S. Ozerden

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kendrick Lamont Casey

Woodville, MS 39669

Defendant

Scott Middlebrooks

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jim Hood-State Gov

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Walter Sillers Building, 550 High Street, Suite 1200

Jackson, MS 39201

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER: On or before November 15, 2019, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5.00 filing fee... see order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/16/19 (PKS) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#4

(#4) Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Kendrick Lamont Casey, re: #3 Order. (PKS) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall file a written response showing cause why case should not be dismissed... see order. Show Cause Response due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/2/19 (PKS) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

1 #2

Notice of Assignment

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kendrick Lamont Casey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(PKS) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall file a written response showing cause why case should not be dismissed... see order. Show Cause Response due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/2/19 (PKS) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Kendrick Lamont Casey, re: #3 Order. (PKS) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: On or before November 15, 2019, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5.00 filing fee... see order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/16/19 (PKS) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kendrick Lamont Casey (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kendrick Lamont Casey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(PKS) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.