This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2020 at 05:14:18 (UTC).

Casey v Does

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 Casey filed an Other lawsuit against Does. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams and Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00083

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward Casey

Defendant

John/Jan Does (1-20)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Martha L. Shaff

Attorney at BETTY NEUMAN & MCMAHON PLC

1900 East 54Th Street

Davenport, IA 52807

Shari L. Friedman

Attorney at MARWEDEL, MINICHELLO & REEB, P.C.

303 West Madison Street, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4266041 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Edward Casey. (Friedman, Shari) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

2 #4

Stipulation of Costs

2 #3

Ad Interim Stipulation for Value

2 #2

Text of Proposed Order

2 #1

Memorandum in Support

#2

(#2) MOTION Entry of Orders Directing Issuance of Notice of Complaint; Approving Ad Interim Stipulation for Value; Approving Stipulation of Costs; and Ordering Monition and Injunctive Relief Restraining Prosecution of Claims by Edward Casey.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, #4 Stipulation of Costs)(Shaff, Martha) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4265759., filed by Edward Casey. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/4/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaff, Martha) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Shari Friedman. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/6/2020. (slg) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4266041 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Edward Casey. (Friedman, Shari) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION Entry of Orders Directing Issuance of Notice of Complaint; Approving Ad Interim Stipulation for Value; Approving Stipulation of Costs; and Ordering Monition and Injunctive Relief Restraining Prosecution of Claims by Edward Casey.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, #4 Stipulation of Costs)(Shaff, Martha) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4265759., filed by Edward Casey. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/4/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaff, Martha) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less