This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:36:23 (UTC).

Caseria v. Walmart Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Caseria filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor A. Bolden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victor A. Bolden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Caseria

Defendant

Walmart Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brooke Amber Goff

Attorney at Goff Law Group LLC

190 Trumbull Street, Ste Floor 4

Hartford, CT 06103

Defendant Attorney

Janice D. Lai

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP

185 Asylum Street, Ste 6Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Walmart Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Statement of No Pending Motions) (Lai, Janice) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Walmart Inc.. (Lai, Janice) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PRETRIAL ORDER by Walmart Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Lai, Janice) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#6

(#6) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/22/2022. Discovery due by 7/23/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/27/2022. Signed by Clerk on 01/21/2022.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/21/2022.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#8

(#8) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/21/2022.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Removal Standing Order

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defense and Jury Demand by Walmart Inc..(Lai, Janice) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#11

(#11) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lai, Janice) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court adopts the following pre-trial schedule:- Initial disclosures, including damages analyses by any party who has a claim for damages, shall be due by April 15, 2022. - Plaintiff shall designate all trial experts and provide opposing counsel with reports from retained experts pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on any issues on which Plaintiff bears the burden of proof by April 21, 2023. - Defendant shall designate all trial experts and provide opposing counsel with reports from retained experts pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on any issues on which Defendant bears the burden of proof by June 23, 2023. - Plaintiff's rebuttal expert reports shall be due by June 23, 2023. - Defendant's rebuttal expert reports shall be due by July 21, 2023. - Depositions shall be completed by July 21, 2023.- All discovery shall be completed by July 21, 2023. - If, after the close of discovery, the parties wish to meet with a Magistrate Judge to discuss settlement, the parties may jointly file such a request by July 28, 2023. - All dispositive motions shall be filed by August 4, 2023.- The Joint Trial Memorandum shall be due by September 29, 2023 or, if dispositive motions are filed, thirty (30) days after the Court's ruling on those motions. - The trial ready date will be November 6, 2023 or thirty (30) days after the filing of the parties' Joint Trial Memorandum, whichever is later. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 03/10/2022. (Castano, Nelson) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lai, Janice) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defense and Jury Demand by Walmart Inc..(Lai, Janice) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/7/2022 (Perez, J.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice of Statement of No Pending Motions filed by Walmart Inc., #1 Notice of Removal filed by Walmart Inc., #2 Notice of Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court filed by Walmart Inc., #5 Notice of Compliance with Pretrial Order filed by Walmart Inc., #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Standing Protective Order, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walmart Inc. Signed by Clerk on 01/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/21/2022.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/21/2022.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/22/2022. Discovery due by 7/23/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/27/2022. Signed by Clerk on 01/21/2022.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketJudge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PRETRIAL ORDER by Walmart Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Lai, Janice) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Walmart Inc.. (Lai, Janice) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Walmart Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Statement of No Pending Motions) (Lai, Janice) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Walmart Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lai, Janice) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from Bridgeport Superior Court, case number FBT-CV-22-6112593-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6799956, filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lai, Janice) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janice D. Lai