This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2021 at 08:50:32 (UTC).

Caselas, LLC v. Austin Bank, Texas, N.A.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Caselas, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Austin Bank, Texas, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy S. Payne and Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00016

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caselas, LLC

Defendant

Austin Bank, Texas, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Scott Fuller

Attorney at Garteiser Honea PLLC

119 W. Ferguson St.

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorneys

Sara Ann Brown

Attorney at Gardere Wynne Sewell, LLP - Dallas

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Cynthia J Rigbsy

Justin Mark Sobaje

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP - Los Angeles

555 South Flower Street, Suite 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2411

Tiffany K. Sung

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP - Los Angeles

555 South Flower Street, Suite 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2411

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffany K. Sung on behalf of Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. (klc, ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#9

(#9) FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffany K. Sung on behalf of Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. (Sung, Tiffany) Modified on 2/17/2021 (klc, ). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Mark Sobaje on behalf of Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. (Sobaje, Justin) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cynthia J Rigbsy on behalf of Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. (Rigbsy, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Austin Bank, Texas, N.A..( Brown, Sara) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Ann Brown on behalf of Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. (Brown, Sara) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caselas, LLC. Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. c/o Debbie Colville. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8220180.), filed by Caselas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 9,. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (klc, ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffany K. Sung on behalf of Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. (klc, ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. to 4/1/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffany K. Sung on behalf of Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. (Sung, Tiffany) Modified on 2/17/2021 (klc, ). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Mark Sobaje on behalf of Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. (Sobaje, Justin) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cynthia J Rigbsy on behalf of Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. (Rigbsy, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Austin Bank, Texas, N.A..( Brown, Sara) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Ann Brown on behalf of Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. (Brown, Sara) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caselas, LLC. Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. c/o Debbie Colville. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Austin Bank, Texas, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8220180.), filed by Caselas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Austin Bank, Texas N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Caselas, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tiffany Kim Sung

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara Ann Brown