This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2023 at 07:26:43 (UTC).

Freedom Patents LLC v. Acer Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2023 Freedom Patents LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Acer Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00299

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freedom Patents LLC

Defendant

Acer Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zachariah Harrington

Matthew J Antonelli

Rehan Mohammed Safiullah

Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis

Catherine Susan Bartles

Larry Dean Thompson, Jr

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Hugh Findlay

Roger Brian Craft

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Acer Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9442166.), filed by Freedom Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan Mohammed Safiullah on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Safiullah, Rehan) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#8

(#8) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Freedom Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Freedom Patents LLC of Related Cases (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Issued as to Acer Inc. (jmb) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Patents LLC. Acer Inc. served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#12

(#12) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Acer Inc..( Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Acer Inc. (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Acer Inc. (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Acer Inc. to 7/17/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Acer Inc..( Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Patents LLC. Acer Inc. served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) SUMMONS Issued as to Acer Inc. (jmb) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE by Freedom Patents LLC of Related Cases (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Freedom Patents LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan Mohammed Safiullah on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Safiullah, Rehan) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of Freedom Patents LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, ) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (daj, ) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Acer Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9442166.), filed by Freedom Patents LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less