This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2023 at 07:01:59 (UTC).

Dorna Sports, S.L. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 09/20/2023 Dorna Sports, S L filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-13907

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dorna Sports, S.L.

Defendant

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

Michael A. Hierl

William Benjamin Kalbac

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (kl, ) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

#27

(#27) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (kl, ) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

#26

(#26) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by December 20, 2023. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#25

(#25) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Dorna Sports, S.L. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#24

RESTRICTED

#23

RESTRICTED

#22

RESTRICTED

#21

RESTRICTED

#20

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dorna Sports, S.L. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Dorna Sports, S.L.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21110813. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (kl, ) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (kl, ) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by December 20, 2023. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Dorna Sports, S.L. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. Exhibit 2 Part 13 of Orozco Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. Exhibit 2 Part 12 of Orozco Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. Exhibit 2 Part 11 of Orozco Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. Exhibit 2 Part 10 of Orozco Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. Exhibit 2 Part 9 of Orozco Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. Exhibit 2 Part 8 of Orozco Declaration (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
09/20/2023

DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, ) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, ) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dorna Sports, S.L. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dorna Sports, S.L. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Dorna Sports, S.L.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21110813. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less