This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/19/2023 at 09:07:08 (UTC).

M.H. v. DOE 1 et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 M H filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00482

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M. H.

Defendants

DOE 1

DOES 2 through 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Blake Jarrod Woodhall

Alyshia Kay Lord

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa Dearden Trepanier

Jacquelynn K. M. Levien

Karl N Haws

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the April 27, 2023 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: The parties are free to amend pleadings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 up to May 26, 2023. A post-mediation status conference is set for November 20, 2023 at 8:30 a.m., with mediation to be completed by November 15. The pre-trial conference will be held on February 22, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. Jury trial will begin on March 5, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES AND DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

#18

(#18) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym re Stipulation for Protective Order #16 . See document for details. (es) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

#17

(#17) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant DOE 1.. (Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

16 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A to Stipulated Protective Order

16 #1

Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER

#16

(#16) STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant DOE 1. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Stipulated Protective Order)(Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#15

(#15) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant DOE 1. Amendment to Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 (Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#14

(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Blake Jarrod Woodhall counsel for Plaintiff M. H.. Kelly Hill is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff M.H.. (Woodhall, Blake) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#3

(#15) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant DOE 1. Amendment to Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 (Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant DOE 1. (Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

1 #7

Exhibit F - Notice to Clerk of Superior Court of Removal

1 #6

Exhibit E - Notice to Adverse Party of Removal

1 #5

Exhibit D - All Other State Court Pleadings

1 #4

Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Statement of Damages

1 #3

Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Declaration of Lisa Dearden Trepanier in Support of Doe 1's Notice of Remov

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVRI2203993 Receipt No: ACACDC-34990172 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant DOE 1. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Dearden Trepanier in Support of Doe 1's Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Statement of Damages, #5 Exhibit D - All Other State Court Pleadings, #6 Exhibit E - Notice to Adverse Party of Removal, #7 Exhibit F - Notice to Clerk of Superior Court of Removal) (Attorney Lisa Dearden Trepanier added to party DOE 1(pty:dft))(Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the April 27, 2023 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: The parties are free to amend pleadings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 up to May 26, 2023. A post-mediation status conference is set for November 20, 2023 at 8:30 a.m., with mediation to be completed by November 15. The pre-trial conference will be held on February 22, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. Jury trial will begin on March 5, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES AND DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

Docket(#19) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel may appear telephonically for Thursday's 04/27/2023 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym re Stipulation for Protective Order #16 . See document for details. (es) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant DOE 1.. (Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant DOE 1. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Stipulated Protective Order)(Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant DOE 1. Amendment to Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 (Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Blake Jarrod Woodhall counsel for Plaintiff M. H.. Kelly Hill is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff M.H.. (Woodhall, Blake) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Blake Jarrod Woodhall counsel for Plaintiff M. H.. Adding Alyshia Lord as counsel of record for M.H. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff M.H. (Woodhall, Blake) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Defendant DOE 1.(Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karl N Haws counsel for Defendant DOE 1. Adding Karl N. Haws as counsel of record for Defendant DOE 1 for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant DOE 1. (Attorney Karl N Haws added to party DOE 1(pty:dft))(Haws, Karl) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for April 27, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than April 20, 2023. See Local Rule 26-1. (aco) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge George H. Wu. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-00482 GW (SPx). (jtil) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa Dearden Trepanier counsel for Defendant DOE 1. Adding Jacquelynn K.M. Levien as counsel of record for Doe 1 for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Doe 1. (Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketFirst Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff M. H. in Riverside Superior Court on 2/17/2023, attached as Exhibit B.(jtil) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DOE 1, identifying The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints. (Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant DOE 1. (Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVRI2203993 Receipt No: ACACDC-34990172 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant DOE 1. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Dearden Trepanier in Support of Doe 1's Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Statement of Damages, #5 Exhibit D - All Other State Court Pleadings, #6 Exhibit E - Notice to Adverse Party of Removal, #7 Exhibit F - Notice to Clerk of Superior Court of Removal) (Attorney Lisa Dearden Trepanier added to party DOE 1(pty:dft))(Trepanier, Lisa) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less