This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2023 at 08:22:31 (UTC).

Patterson et al v. Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 Patterson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-11211

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Girard Patterson

Maribeth Murphy

Kelli Mackey

Danielle Olson

Jacqueline Vorpahl

Kai Vorpahl

Katie McGuire

Valeria Salerno Gonzalez

Tracie Wilson

Joseph Smith

Anne Boyle

Nicole Sapienza

Haley Lamonica

Nathtia Dennis

John Doe

Steven Keenholtz

Kara Harrison

Defendants

Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc.

Point32Health, Inc.

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony L. Parkhill

Ben Barnow

David Pastor

Richard E. Levine

Christina Xenides

Patrick J. Sheehan

James J. Reardon

Robert J. Bonsignore

Kristen M. Hurley

Philip J. Gordon

Kurt J. Hagstrom

Robert T. Naumes, Jr.

Randi A. Kassan

James J. Pizzirusso

Jason M. Leviton

Steven N. Nathan

John A. Yanchunis

Kelsey R. Raycroft

Other Attorneys

Ian J. McLoughlin

Kaleigh Boyd

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE by Girard Patterson Third Notice of Related Case (Pastor, David) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

#18

(#18) NOTICE by Girard Patterson Second Notice of Related Case (Pastor, David) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

#17

(#17) NOTICE by Girard Patterson Notice of Related Cases (Pastor, David) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#16

(#16) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS AND SETTING LEADERSHIP BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#15

(#15) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered ALLOWING #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Set Leadership Briefing Schedule by Maribeth Murphy, Girard Patterson. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

13 #1

Certification of Anthony L. Parkhill

#13

(#13) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anthony L. Parkhill Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9927943 by Maribeth Murphy, Girard Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Anthony L. Parkhill)(Pastor, David) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

12 #1

Certification of Ben Barnow

#12

(#12) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ben Barnow Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9927927 by Maribeth Murphy, Girard Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ben Barnow)(Pastor, David) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc., Point32Health, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Point32Health, Inc. for Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc... (Marcucci, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#6

(#11) Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: In the Order (ECF No. 10) Allowing #6 Motion for Extension of time to file an answer, the stricken segment of the order re a 60 day extension should be disregarded as it was entered in error. Parties should adhere to the portion re a 21 day extension following the ruling on the motion to consolidate. (Warnock, Douglas) Modified on 6/22/2023 (Warnock, Douglas). (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Point32Health, Inc. served on 6/1/2023, answer due 6/22/2023. (Pastor, David) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/23/2023 to correct page orientation) (Warnock, Douglas). (Entered: 06/07/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc. served on 6/1/2023, answer due 6/22/2023. (Pastor, David) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc., Point32Health, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

1 #2

Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#10) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , #1 Complaint; Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc answer due 8/22/2023; Point32Health, Inc. answer due 8/22/2023. Defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading is extended until 21 days after the resolution of the motion to consolidate. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE APPROVING #17 NOTICE by Girard Patterson Notice of Related Cases (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) NOTICE by Girard Patterson Third Notice of Related Case (Pastor, David) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) NOTICE by Girard Patterson Second Notice of Related Case (Pastor, David) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) NOTICE by Girard Patterson Notice of Related Cases (Pastor, David) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS AND SETTING LEADERSHIP BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered ALLOWING #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Set Leadership Briefing Schedule by Maribeth Murphy, Girard Patterson. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 and #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ben Barnow and Anthony L. Parkhill Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account.(Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 07/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anthony L. Parkhill Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9927943 by Maribeth Murphy, Girard Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Anthony L. Parkhill)(Pastor, David) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ben Barnow Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9927927 by Maribeth Murphy, Girard Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ben Barnow)(Pastor, David) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: In the Order (ECF No. 10) Allowing #6 Motion for Extension of time to file an answer, the stricken segment of the order re a 60 day extension should be disregarded as it was entered in error. Parties should adhere to the portion re a 21 day extension following the ruling on the motion to consolidate. (Warnock, Douglas) Modified on 6/22/2023 (Warnock, Douglas). (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , #1 Complaint; Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc answer due 8/22/2023; Point32Health, Inc. answer due 8/22/2023. Defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading is extended until 21 days after the resolution of the motion to consolidate. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna L. LaPointe on behalf of Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc., Point32Health, Inc. (LaPointe, Jenna) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Set Leadership Briefing Schedule by Maribeth Murphy, Girard Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pastor, David) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc., Point32Health, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Point32Health, Inc. for Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc... (Marcucci, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc., Point32Health, Inc..(Marcucci, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Point32Health, Inc. served on 6/1/2023, answer due 6/22/2023. (Pastor, David) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/23/2023 to correct page orientation) (Warnock, Douglas). (Entered: 06/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc. served on 6/1/2023, answer due 6/22/2023. (Pastor, David) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Harvard Pilgrim Health Care, Inc., Point32Health, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9879556 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Maribeth Murphy, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Girard Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Pastor, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/31/2023) (McManus, Caetlin). (Entered: 05/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less