This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2023 at 12:29:01 (UTC).

Holly McCoy v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 Holly McCoy filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-04289

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holly Mccoy

Defendants

FCA US LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tionna Grace Dolin

Elizabeth A LaRocque

Mark William Gibson

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Tsai

Spencer Peter Hugret

Timothy Alexander Hanna

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) DECLARATION of ELIZABETH A. LAROCQUE IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CERRITOS DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION filed by Plaintiff Holly McCoy. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#21

(#21) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Holly McCoy. correcting Declaration #20 (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#20

(#20) DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. LaRocque IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Plaintiff Holly McCoy. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

#19

(#19) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 9/8/2023 why this action should not be dismissed as to defendant Cerritos Dodge Chrysler Jeep for lack of prosecution. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed as to defendant Cerritos Dodge Chrysler Jeep if the document(s) mentioned in this order are not filed by the date indicated above. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

#18

(#18) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 12-01-2023 (early mediation deadline); 07-16-2024. The parties shall file a joint report no later than seven (7) days after the ADR proceeding regarding the progress of settlement discussions. Joint status report re settlement due by: 12-08-2023 (joint report re results of early mediation); 07-23-2024 (rolm) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

17 #1

Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 9/10/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates) (rolm) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULE REPORT of Pre-trial and Trial Dates Worksheet filed by Plaintiff Holly McCoy. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

#14

(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Holly McCoy.. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

1 #15

Exhibit N to ET Decl

1 #14

Exhibit M to ET Decl

1 #13

Exhibit L to ET Decl

1 #12

Exhibit K to ET Decl

1 #11

Exhibit J to ET Decl

1 #9

Exhibit H to ET Decl

1 #5

Exhibit D to ET Decl

1 #4

Exhibit C to ET Decl

1 #2

Exhibit A to ET Decl

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Having received Plaintiffs declaration #22 , the Court hereby DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause filed on August 30, 2023 #19 . IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) DECLARATION of ELIZABETH A. LAROCQUE IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT CERRITOS DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION filed by Plaintiff Holly McCoy. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Holly McCoy. correcting Declaration #20 (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. LaRocque IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Plaintiff Holly McCoy. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 9/8/2023 why this action should not be dismissed as to defendant Cerritos Dodge Chrysler Jeep for lack of prosecution. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed as to defendant Cerritos Dodge Chrysler Jeep if the document(s) mentioned in this order are not filed by the date indicated above. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 12-01-2023 (early mediation deadline); 07-16-2024. The parties shall file a joint report no later than seven (7) days after the ADR proceeding regarding the progress of settlement discussions. Joint status report re settlement due by: 12-08-2023 (joint report re results of early mediation); 07-23-2024 (rolm) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 9/10/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates) (rolm) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

Docket(#16) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on July 21, 2023. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) SCHEDULE REPORT of Pre-trial and Trial Dates Worksheet filed by Plaintiff Holly McCoy. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Holly McCoy.. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/10/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT against Defendants Cerritos Dodge Chrysler Jeep, Does, FCA US LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Holly McCoy. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/01/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy Alexander Hanna on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Timothy Alexander Hanna added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hanna, Timothy) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric Tsai on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC, FCA North America Holdings LLC, Stellantis Ventures B.V. (formerly known as FCA Holdco B.V.), Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 23NWCV00712 Receipt No: ACACDC-35418336 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of ET iso Removal, #2 Exhibit A to ET Decl, #3 Exhibit B to ET Decl, #4 Exhibit C to ET Decl, #5 Exhibit D to ET Decl, #6 Exhibit E to ET Decl, #7 Exhibit F to ET Decl, #8 Exhibit G to ET Decl, #9 Exhibit H to ET Decl, #10 Exhibit I to ET Decl, #11 Exhibit J to ET Decl, #12 Exhibit K to ET Decl, #13 Exhibit L to ET Decl, #14 Exhibit M to ET Decl, #15 Exhibit N to ET Decl, #16 Exhibit O to ET Decl, #17 Exhibit P to ET Decl, #18 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Eric Tsai added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less