This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2023 at 06:10:33 (UTC).

Todd v. Huntington National Bank et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2023 Todd filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Huntington National Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00438

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jordan Todd

Defendants

Pentagon

Truist Bank

Huntington National Bank

Pentagon FCU

SunTrust Bank

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron M. Swift

William M. Kaludis

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey W. Larroca

Jeremey R. Goolsby

Robert F. Tom

Joseph N. Tucker

Catherine C. Dugan

Katherine R. Rogers

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 2/4/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5C before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Exhibit List due by 1/20/2025. Witness List due by 1/20/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2025 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5C before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/20/2025. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/5/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

#45

(#45) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/2/2023. Discovery due by 4/12/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/24/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

44 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

#44

(#44) MOTION for attorney Jeffrey W. Larroca to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3894645) by Pentagon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Goolsby, Jeremey) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

#43

(#43) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kaludis, William) (Entered: 08/18/2023)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine C. Dugan on behalf of Huntington National Bank (Dugan, Catherine) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

1 #9

Exhibit H- 1/27/2023 Swift law dispute

1 #8

Exhibit G- 4/19/2022 Swift law dispute

1 #7

Exhibit F- 11/29/2021 Equifax response

1 #6

Exhibit E- 8/27/2021TransUnion response

1 #5

Exhibit D- 6/30/21 attorney supplied dispute for Jordon Todd, # (11)

1 #4

Exhibit C- Gallatin Police report

1 #3

Exhibit B- 5/3/2021 TransUnion response

1 #2

Exhibit A- Shield Law dispute letter

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 2/4/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5C before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Exhibit List due by 1/20/2025. Witness List due by 1/20/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2025 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5C before District Judge Eli J. Richardson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/20/2025. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/5/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER granting #44 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Jeffrey W. Larroca to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 08/28/2023. (lh) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/2/2023. Discovery due by 4/12/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/24/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 8/24/2023. (Hearing lasted 00:06)(sd) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION for attorney Jeffrey W. Larroca to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3894645) by Pentagon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Goolsby, Jeremey) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kaludis, William) (Entered: 08/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Catherine C. Dugan admitted to this court. (mg) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine C. Dugan on behalf of Huntington National Bank (Dugan, Catherine) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Joseph N. Tucker: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 8/2/2023. (mg) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketKY State Bar status verified as active for Joseph N. Tucker admitted to this court. (mg) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed by Jordan Todd. Capitol One Bank (USA), N., served on 5/12/2023. (Kaludis, William) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Jordan Todd. Calvary Portfolio Services, LLC served on 5/11/2023. (Kaludis, William) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Jordan Todd. Truist Bank served on 5/9/2023. (Kaludis, William) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 05/08/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons issued as to Calvary Portfolio Services, LLC, Capitol One Bank (USA), N., Huntington National Bank, Pentagon, Truist Bank. Service copies will be picked up by counsel at intake. (ad) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for William M. Kaludis admitted to this court. (ad) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/13/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ad) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Calvary Portfolio Services, LLC, Capitol One Bank (USA), N.,, Huntington National Bank, Pentagon, Truist Bank (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3815492), filed by Jordan Todd. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Shield Law dispute letter, #3 Exhibit B- 5/3/2021 TransUnion response, #4 Exhibit C- Gallatin Police report, #5 Exhibit D- 6/30/21 attorney supplied dispute for Jordon Todd, # 11, #6 Exhibit E- 8/27/2021TransUnion response, #7 Exhibit F- 11/29/2021 Equifax response, #8 Exhibit G- 4/19/2022 Swift law dispute, #9 Exhibit H- 1/27/2023 Swift law dispute)(ad) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less