This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2023 at 07:28:58 (UTC).

Caulfield et al v. The Home Depot et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2023 Caulfield filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Home Depot. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Calabretta and Allison Claire. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01316

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel J. Calabretta

Referral Judge

Allison Claire

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roy Caulfield

Renee Caulfield

Defendants

The Home Depot

The Home Depot, Inc

Home Depot Store Support, Inc.

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Home Depot Product Authority, LLC

New Home Depot Product Authority, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Grant A. Winter

David P. Mastagni

Defendant Attorneys

Zachary S. Tolson

Angelique Hernandez

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Solano Superior Court, case number CU23-01531 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10944934) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties)(Tolson, Zachary) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Interested Parties

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Perdue, C.) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

3 #1

Standing Order

3 #2

Consent Form

3 #3

VDRP

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of filed-endorsed Answer by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) Modified on 7/20/2023 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#6

(#6) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Hernandez, Angelique added. (Hernandez, Angelique) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Hernandez, Angelique added. (Hernandez, Angelique) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of filed-endorsed Answer by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) Modified on 7/20/2023 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 07/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Perdue, C.) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Solano Superior Court, case number CU23-01531 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10944934) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties)(Tolson, Zachary) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less