This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2023 at 08:01:44 (UTC).

Allen v. California Department of Parks and Recreation

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 Allen filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against California Department of Parks and Recreation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan van Keulen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-02425

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan van Keulen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Avery Kavon Allen

Defendant

California Department of Parks and Recreation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harris Mateen

Isabella Corbo

Nicholas Reddick

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER Appointing Counsel; Staying Case. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on July 10, 2023. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

#15

(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING 8/22/23 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 9/5/23. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2023 is continued to 9/5/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/03/2023)

14 #1

Envelope

#14

(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Avery Kavon Allen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2023) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

#13

(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Avery Kavon Allen.. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2023) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#12

(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/19/2023. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER RE REFERRAL TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT; RE STAYING OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/24/23. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#9

(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2023 at 9:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) ORDER ADOPTING #5 Report and Recommendations and IT IS ORDERED that the case be TRANSFERRED to the San Jose Division of the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#6

(#6) Certified Mail Receipt of #5 Report and Recommendations. (dm) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#5

(#7) ORDER ADOPTING #5 Report and Recommendations and IT IS ORDERED that the case be TRANSFERRED to the San Jose Division of the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER (dated 08/11/2016) REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (jv2) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

#3

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Avery Kavon Allen, #1 Complaint filed by Avery Kavon Allen, #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Avery Kavon Allen, ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Avery Kavon Allen. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#2

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Avery Kavon Allen, #1 Complaint filed by Avery Kavon Allen, #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Avery Kavon Allen, ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Avery Kavon Allen. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Avery Kavon Allen, #1 Complaint filed by Avery Kavon Allen, #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Avery Kavon Allen, ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Avery Kavon Allen. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Appointing Counsel; Staying Case. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on July 10, 2023. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING 8/22/23 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 9/5/23. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2023 is continued to 9/5/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Avery Kavon Allen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2023) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Avery Kavon Allen.. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2023) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/19/2023. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Remark: #10 sent to federal pro bono project (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2023) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RE REFERRAL TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT; RE STAYING OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/24/23. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Consent/Declination due by 6/1/2023. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2023) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2023 at 9:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:23-cv-00255. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER ADOPTING #5 Report and Recommendations and IT IS ORDERED that the case be TRANSFERRED to the San Jose Division of the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certified Mail Receipt of #5 Report and Recommendations. (dm) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketCASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (dm) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Avery Kavon Allen, #1 Complaint filed by Avery Kavon Allen, #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Avery Kavon Allen, ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Avery Kavon Allen. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER (dated 08/11/2016) REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (jv2) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (jv2) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jv2) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Avery Kavon Allen. (jv2) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Avery Kavon Allen. (jv2) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Avery Kavon Allen (No filing fee submitted) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(jv2) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less