This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2023 at 08:21:54 (UTC).

Littlejohn v. Deputy J. Davis et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2023 Littlejohn filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Deputy J Davis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-03186

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daytwon Littlejohn

Defendants

Deputy J. Davis

MCSO Deputies

Montgomery County Sheriff's Office

Houston Police Department

Harris County Sherrif's Office

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Deputy J. Davis, Harris County Sherrif's Office, Houston Police Department, MCSO Deputies, Montgomery County Sheriff's Office (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Daytwon Littlejohn. (AaronJackson, 4) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

#2

(#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Daytwon Littlejohn, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/19/2023. (AaronJackson, 4) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (AaronJackson, 4) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

#5

(#5) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Daytwon Littlejohn, filed.(MaraGonzales, 2) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Without Paying the Filing Fee as to Daytwon Littlejohn; granting #2 . (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified. (GlendaHassan, 4) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Email sent to Manager of Three Strikes List. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 9/19/2023 (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#9

(#9) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Daytwon Littlejohn re: #8 Order of Dismissal, filed. (GeorgeKelner, 4) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/12/2023

Docket*** REMAILED Order Dismissing Case (38) to Plaintiff's updated address with his prisoner ID Number included. Remailed through our Noticing System on October 12, 2023. (BeverlyGoolsby, 4) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Daytwon Littlejohn re: #8 Order of Dismissal, filed. (GeorgeKelner, 4) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 9/19/2023 (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Email sent to Manager of Three Strikes List. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Without Paying the Filing Fee as to Daytwon Littlejohn; granting #2 . (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified. (GlendaHassan, 4) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Daytwon Littlejohn, filed.(MaraGonzales, 2) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (AaronJackson, 4) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Daytwon Littlejohn, filed. (AaronJackson, 4) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Daytwon Littlejohn, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/19/2023. (AaronJackson, 4) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Deputy J. Davis, Harris County Sherrif's Office, Houston Police Department, MCSO Deputies, Montgomery County Sheriff's Office (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Daytwon Littlejohn. (AaronJackson, 4) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less