This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2023 at 08:16:43 (UTC).

The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Tyler et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2023 The Prudential Insurance Company of America filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Tyler. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy J. Corrigan and Laura Lothman Lambert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00567

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

Referral Judge

Laura Lothman Lambert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Defendants

Shirlee Tyler

Diane L. Tyler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sierra Steele

Stevie E. Baker

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Rule. 7.1 Statement

#5

(#5) PROPOSED summons to be issued by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Steele, Sierra) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Diane L. Tyler. (BD) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED summons to be issued by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Steele, Sierra) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Shirlee Tyler. (MDC) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Shirlee Tyler. (MDC) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED summons to be issued by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Steele, Sierra) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Diane L. Tyler. (BD) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED summons to be issued by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Steele, Sierra) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Docket(#4) DOCKETED IN ERROR. Modified on 5/15/2023 (AMM). (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AMM) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:23-cv-567-TJC-LLL. (AM) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20831553) filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Rule. 7.1 Statement)(Baker, Stevie) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less