This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2023 at 07:47:47 (UTC).

Lewis v. U.S. Department of Health & Human Services et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2023 Lewis filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against U S Department of Health Human Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00390

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Racquel Lewis

Defendants

U.S. Department of Health & Human Services

Employee Assistance Program

Medicaid/Medicare

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Racquel Lewis. (mkr) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit 1

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #3

Exhibit 3

2 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of #4 Magistrate Consent Forms. Acknowledgment filed, by Racquel Lewis. (mkr) Modified on 4/12/2023 (nms). (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#6

(#7) MOTION to Seal the Complaint and All Supporting Documents - filed by Racquel Lewis. (smg) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting D.I. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/12/2023. (lah) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Amend Complaint - filed by Racquel Lewis. (smg) Modified on 4/28/2023 (nms). (Entered: 04/28/2023)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Seal all requests, claims, and evidence filed on 5/2/2023 - filed by Racquel Lewis. (mkr) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#10

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) [SEALED] MOTION to Consolidate - filed by Racquel Lewis. (mkr) Modified on 5/3/2023 (nms). (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Seal all requests, claims, and evidence filed on 5/2/2023 - filed by Racquel Lewis. (mkr) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Amend Complaint - filed by Racquel Lewis. (smg) Modified on 4/28/2023 (nms). (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Seal the Complaint and All Supporting Documents - filed by Racquel Lewis. (smg) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting D.I. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/12/2023. (lah) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of #4 Magistrate Consent Forms. Acknowledgment filed, by Racquel Lewis. (mkr) Modified on 4/12/2023 (nms). (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) [SEALED] Exhibits (Medical Records) to #2 Complaint, filed by Racquel Lewis. (mkr) Modified on 4/12/2023 (nms). (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Employee Assistance Program, Medicaid/Medicare, and U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. - filed by Racquel Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (mkr) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Racquel Lewis. (mkr) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less