This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2023 at 07:04:39 (UTC).

Morrow v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 Morrow filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against USAA Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00125

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mallory Morrow

Defendant

USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Austin Hayes Easley

Defendant Attorney

Lauren Oswalt Baber

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against USAA Casualty Insurance Company filed by Mallory Morrow. Fee $402; Receipt No. JON161. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Mallory Morrow. USAA Casualty Insurance Company served on 6/5/2023. (Easley, Austin) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

#6

(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/18/2023; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/2/2023; Jury Trial proposed for sometime during the week of 1/6/2025 at 9:30 a.m. in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/10/2023. (ljb) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/18/2023; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/2/2023; Jury Trial proposed for sometime during the week of 1/6/2025 at 9:30 a.m. in Helena Courtroom #314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/10/2023. (ljb) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 motion for extension of time to answer the complaint. USAA Casualty Insurance Company's answer is now due by 7/10/2023. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 06/27/23. (ble) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Baber, Lauren) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Mallory Morrow. USAA Casualty Insurance Company served on 6/5/2023. (Easley, Austin) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against USAA Casualty Insurance Company filed by Mallory Morrow. Fee $402; Receipt No. JON161. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less