This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2023 at 13:51:55 (UTC).

Holland v. Allstate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 Holland filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-05290

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Viola Holland

Defendant

Allstate Insurance Company

Interested Party

Hurricane Ida Program Administrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chanel Dyon Long

Austin Marks

Defendant Attorneys

Jeanne Arceneaux

Michael Edward Hill

Interested Party Attorney

Francis Joseph Lobrano

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for Orleans Parish, case number 2023-07280 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10151313) filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Jeanne Arceneaux added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Arceneaux, Jeanne) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Notice of Compliance by Allstate Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Arceneaux, Jeanne) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#4

(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company (Arceneaux, Jeanne) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#5

(#5) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with Addendum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/22.(cg) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#6

(#6) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#7

(#7) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

#8

(#8) Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

#9

(#9) Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with Addendum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/22.(cg) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company (Arceneaux, Jeanne) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Compliance by Allstate Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Arceneaux, Jeanne) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (kls) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for Orleans Parish, case number 2023-07280 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10151313) filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Jeanne Arceneaux added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Arceneaux, Jeanne) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less