This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/19/2023 at 16:15:53 (UTC).

Stasit, LLC v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2023 Stasit, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LG Electronics U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00527

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stasit, LLC

Defendant

LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William P. Ramey, III

Joseph J. Zito

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17685907), filed by Stasit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A-B

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Stasit, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Stasit, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE Notice of Related Cases by Stasit, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stasit, LLC. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 7/26/2023, answer due 8/16/2023. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/10/2023)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/10/2023)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph J. Zito on behalf of Stasit, LLC. Attorney Joseph J. Zito added to party Stasit, LLC(pty:pla) (Zito, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph J. Zito on behalf of Stasit, LLC. Attorney Joseph J. Zito added to party Stasit, LLC(pty:pla) (Zito, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant's answer or responsive pleading be submitted to the Court on or before October 2, 2023. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stasit, LLC. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 7/26/2023, answer due 8/16/2023. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketCase assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ad3) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE Notice of Related Cases by Stasit, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Stasit, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Stasit, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17685907), filed by Stasit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less