This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2023 at 08:28:39 (UTC).

Jones v. Allied Universal Security Services

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 Jones filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Allied Universal Security Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terrence W. Boyle and Brian S. Meyers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00291

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

Referral Judge

Brian S. Meyers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tamara Amber Jones

Defendant

Universal Protection Service, LLC d/b/a Allied Universal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aliyah S. Adams

Dawn T. Mistretta

Defendant Attorney

Kelly Eisenlohr-Moul

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tamara Amber Jones. Universal Protection Service, LLC served on 7/18/2023, answer due 8/8/2023. (Adams, Aliyah) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

12 #2

Text of Proposed Order

12 #1

Supplement Memo in Support

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) Summons Issued as to Universal Protection Service, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

10 #1

Proposed Summons Proposed Amended Summons

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Aliyah S. Adams on behalf of Tamara Amber Jones. (Adams, Aliyah) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Dawn T. Mistretta on behalf of Tamara Amber Jones. (Mistretta, Dawn) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#7

(#7) Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Insufficient Process, and Insufficient Service of Process. Response due by 6/30/2023. Sent to Tamara Amber Jones at 1008 Pecan Court North Apt. C Wilson, NC 27893 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

6 #2

Memorandum of Law

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) Order Redesignating Division to Western Division. This case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future filings should reflect the new case number of 5:23-CV-291-BO-BM. No further filing shall be made in 4:23-CV-91-BO-BM. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/31/2023. Copy sent via US Mail to Tamara Amber Jones at 1008 Pecan Court North, Apt. C, Wilson, NC 27893. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Kelly Eisenlohr-Moul on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services. (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#3

(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Allied Universal Security Services identifying Corporate Parent Allied Universal Security Services for Allied Universal Security Services. (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

2 #2

Main Document

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tamara Amber Jones. Universal Protection Service, LLC served on 7/18/2023, answer due 8/8/2023. (Adams, Aliyah) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Allied Universal Security Services, Universal Protection Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to Universal Protection Service, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tamara Amber Jones, filed by Tamara Amber Jones. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Summons) (Adams, Aliyah) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Aliyah S. Adams on behalf of Tamara Amber Jones. (Adams, Aliyah) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Dawn T. Mistretta on behalf of Tamara Amber Jones. (Mistretta, Dawn) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Insufficient Process, and Insufficient Service of Process. Response due by 6/30/2023. Sent to Tamara Amber Jones at 1008 Pecan Court North Apt. C Wilson, NC 27893 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Insufficient Process, and Insufficient Service of Process filed by Allied Universal Security Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law) (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Redesignating Division to Western Division. This case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future filings should reflect the new case number of 5:23-CV-291-BO-BM. No further filing shall be made in 4:23-CV-91-BO-BM. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/31/2023. Copy sent via US Mail to Tamara Amber Jones at 1008 Pecan Court North, Apt. C, Wilson, NC 27893. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Kelly Eisenlohr-Moul on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services. (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Allied Universal Security Services identifying Corporate Parent Allied Universal Security Services for Allied Universal Security Services. (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement and requirement to file a Notice of Self-Representation and Financial Disclosure Statement along with blank forms mailed via US Mail to Tamara Jones at 1008 Pecan Court North, Apt. C, Wilson, NC 27893 mailed via US Mail on May 31, 2023. (Rudd, D.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2023: #1 Corrected Notice) (Rudd, D.). (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-5] Financial Disclosure Statement. The Financial Disclosure statement is a stand alone document therefore Counsel is directed to refile the Financial Disclosure Statement using the event "Other-Documents - Financial Disclosure Statement. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, [1-5] Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allied Universal Security Services from North Carolina Wilson District Superior Division, case number 23CVS513. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7111746), filed by Allied Universal Security Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A- State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit B- Notice of Removal, #5 Financial Disclosure Form) (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) Modified on 5/31/2023 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.) Modified on 5/31/2023 (Rudd, D.). (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less