This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2023 at 13:17:06 (UTC).

Dole v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2023 Dole filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-22905

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Vickie L Dole

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim International (GmbH)

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco S.A .de C.V.

Chattem, Inc.

Patheon Manufacturing Service, LLC

Sanofi S.A.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation

Apotex Corporation

Apotex Inc.

Auro Health LLC

Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.

Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd.

Cardinal Health Inc.

Costco Wholesale Corporation

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Brett A. Emison

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International (GmbH), Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco S.A.de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Coroporation, Chattem, Inc., Patheon Manufacturing Service, LLC, Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, filed by Vickie L Dole.(Emison, Brett) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Vickie L Dole. (Emison, Brett) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

 

Docket Entries

05/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #4 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Vickie L Dole. (Emison, Brett) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International (GmbH), Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco S.A.de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Coroporation, Chattem, Inc., Patheon Manufacturing Service, LLC, Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, filed by Vickie L Dole.(Emison, Brett) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketCivil Case Terminated. Case is stayed and closed per Pretrial Order #80 in 20-MD-2924-RLR. Closing Case. (jc) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

Docket(#3) Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party (AmeriSource Health Services LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (jc) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

Docket(#2) MDL 2924 Judge Assignment with Tag-Along Case Receipt from the Southern District of Florida. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg assigned FLSD Case Number 23-22905-CIV-ROSENBERG. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-MD-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (jc) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16509990, filed by Vickie L Dole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Emison, Brett) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less