This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 13:49:56 (UTC).

FREDERICK v. LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 FREDERICK filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Rukhsanah L. Singh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-20399

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Rukhsanah L. Singh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYLLIS FREDERICK

Defendants

LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC

JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

KENVUE, INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL STEVEN GOETZ

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC, JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., KENVUE, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC with JURY DEMAND, filed by PHYLLIS FREDERICK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GOETZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC, JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., KENVUE, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jjc, ) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/20/2023

DocketMember Case Direct File on 9/15/2023, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jxh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC, JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., KENVUE, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jjc, ) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC, JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., KENVUE, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC with JURY DEMAND, filed by PHYLLIS FREDERICK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GOETZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less