On May 16, 2023, Areej Al-Sadhan and Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan, an Incompetent, by his Sister and next Friend Areej Al-Sadhan (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Jim Walden, Avni P. Patel, Deanna Paul, Peter A. Devlin, and Catherine Weiss of Walden Macht & Haran LLP; Marc Van Der and Hout Johnny Sinodis of Van Der Hout LLP; and Andrea J. Prasow of The Freedom Initiative, filed Racketeering Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Twitter, Inc., the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Saud Al-Qahtani, Ahmad Abouammo, Ali Alzabarah, Ahmed Almutairi a/k/a Ahmed Aljbreen, Bader Al-Asaker, Saudi Arabian Cultural Mission, and John Does 1-10 (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages and declaratory relief for alleged violation of the Racketeering Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act (“RICO”). This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for Northern District of California, with Judge Kandis A. Westmore presiding.
In the complaint, the plaintiffs alleged, “Plaintiff Areej Al-Sadhan, a U.S. citizen, is an activist speaking out about the disappearance and torture of her brother, Plaintiff Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan, who resided and studied in the United States for several years, in Saudi Arabia. Plaintiff Abdulrahman was kidnapped, tortured, and imprisoned for operating an anonymous Twitter account critical of the government of the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia (‘Defendant KSA’).”
The plaintiffs further alleged, “Plaintiff Abdulrahman’s family has not heard from him since 2021. Because of Plaintiff Areej’s advocacy, Plaintiff Areej has been targeted by Defendant KSA and its agents, including non-party Prime Minister and Crown Prince Mohammed bin Salman (‘MBS’), as well as Defendants John Does 1-10.”
Plaintiffs also alleged, “The racketeering enterprise in this suit is a group of individuals and entities with the shared goal of transnational repression (the ‘Saudi Criminal Enterprise’). The Saudi Criminal Enterprise seeks to extend Defendant KSA’s authoritarian control beyond Saudi Arabia’s borders, including by reaching into U.S.-based businesses and commerce, and stifling discourse critical of Defendant KSA and the Saudi royal family around the world.”
The plaintiffs then alleged, “The Saudi Criminal Enterprise has since targeted numerous supposed dissidents, including Plaintiffs Areej and Abdulrahman, by infiltrating the United States market, accessing Defendant Twitter’s confidential data on its users with assistance from two of Defendant Twitter’s own employees, and supplying that data to Defendant KSA to target and retaliate against its critics, by kidnapping, torturing, imprisoning, and killing perceived dissidents.”
The plaintiffs further alleged, “After Plaintiff Areej’s activism brought international pressure on Defendant KSA and highlighted how Plaintiff Abdulrahman was arbitrarily detained without charges against him, Defendant KSA brought baseless allegations against him—primarily related to his U.S.-based, protected speech on Twitter—in a sham trial before sentencing him to 20 years in prison, with the principal purpose of silencing Plaintiff Areej and others who challenged Defendant KSA.”
Plaintiffs then alleged, “The Saudi Criminal Enterprise’s pattern of unlawful racketeering to quell political dissent, including by deploying confidential information for unlawful purposes and threatening human life, violates the Racketeering Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act (‘RICO’).”
Plaintiffs presented three claims for relief, including violation of RICO, tort under the Alien Tort Statute, and conspiracy under RICO.
In the prayer for relief, the plaintiffs requested a judgment for declaratory relief. The plaintiffs also requested an award of monetary, punitive, and exemplary damages with pre-judgment interest.
This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.
4:23-CV-02369
05/16/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act
Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Areej Al-Sadhan
Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan
Ahmed Almutairi
Twitter Inc.
Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Ahmad Abouammo
Saudi Arabian Cultural Mission
Saud Al-Qahtani
Ahmed Aljbreen
Bader Al-Asaker
Ali Alzabarah
X Corp., as Successor in Interest to Named Defendant Twitter, Inc.
Catherine Marie Weiss
John Nicholas Sinodis
Marc Van Der Hout
Avni P Patel
Jim Walden
Peter A. Devlin
Deanna Paul
Benjamin Berkowitz
Anjali Srinivasan
Ryan James Hayward
William Hamilton Jordan
(#30) Request for Judicial Notice re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed byTwitter Inc., X Corp., as Successor in Interest to Named Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Related document(s) #29 ) (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/12/2023) (Entered: 07/12/2023)
Proposed Order
Declaration of Twitter Employee
Declaration of Benjamin Berkowitz
(#29) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Twitter Inc., X Corp., as Successor in Interest to Named Defendant Twitter, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 7/26/2023. Replies due by 8/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Berkowitz, #2 Declaration of Twitter Employee, #3 Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/12/2023) (Entered: 07/12/2023)
*Restricted*
Certificate/Proof of Service
Jt. Stip and Req. ISO Mtn. to Seal
(#28) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Twitter Inc., X Corp., as Successor in Interest to Named Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Hamilton Jordan, #2 Jt. Stip and Req. ISO Mtn. to Seal, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service, #5 Unredacted Version of Twitter Decl.) (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/12/2023) (Entered: 07/12/2023)
(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18270599.) filed by Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan, Areej Al-Sadhan. (Paul, Deanna) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18270581.) filed by Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan, Areej Al-Sadhan. (Patel, Avni) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18270242.) filed by Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan, Areej Al-Sadhan. (Walden, Jim) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
(#5) Summons Issued as to Ahmad Abouammo, Bader Al-Asaker, Saud Al-Qahtani, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah, Saudi Arabian Cultural Mission, Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Twitter Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2023 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
#Electronic filing error. Summons will not be issued to DOE defendants. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan, Areej Al-Sadhan. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
Exhibit Exhibits
Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
#Electronic filing error. Party Ali Alzabarah has been entered on the docket. Filer is reminded to enter ALL parties as named in the Complaint. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan, Areej Al-Sadhan. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
Docket(#31) CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. #29 . Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file the #29 motion to dismiss. Hearing date of September 14, 2023, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. September 14, 2023 was not the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was e-filed. If counsel would like to request an earlier date, an administrative motion or a stipulation and proposed order should be e-filed after the motion is re-noticed. And if granted, the Court will advance the hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2023) (Entered: 07/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#30) Request for Judicial Notice re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed byTwitter Inc., X Corp., as Successor in Interest to Named Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Related document(s) #29 ) (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/12/2023) (Entered: 07/12/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#29) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Twitter Inc., X Corp., as Successor in Interest to Named Defendant Twitter, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 7/26/2023. Replies due by 8/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Berkowitz, #2 Declaration of Twitter Employee, #3 Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/12/2023) (Entered: 07/12/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#28) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Twitter Inc., X Corp., as Successor in Interest to Named Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Hamilton Jordan, #2 Jt. Stip and Req. ISO Mtn. to Seal, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service, #5 Unredacted Version of Twitter Decl.) (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/12/2023) (Entered: 07/12/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#27) PROOF OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan, Areej Al-Sadhan (Walden, Jim) (Filed on 7/5/2023) Modified on 7/5/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/05/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#26) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by X Corp., as Successor in Interest to Named Defendant Twitter, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent X Holdings Corp. for X Corp., as Successor in Interest to Named Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/9/2023) (Entered: 06/09/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#25) JOINT STIPULATION Extending Twitters Time to Respond to Complaint filed by X Corp., as Successor in Interest to Named Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/9/2023) (Entered: 06/09/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan James Hayward (Hayward, Ryan) (Filed on 6/9/2023) (Entered: 06/09/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by William Hamilton Jordan (Jordan, William) (Filed on 6/9/2023) (Entered: 06/09/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Anjali Srinivasan (Srinivasan, Anjali) (Filed on 6/9/2023) (Entered: 06/09/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18270599.) filed by Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan, Areej Al-Sadhan. (Paul, Deanna) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18270581.) filed by Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan, Areej Al-Sadhan. (Patel, Avni) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18270242.) filed by Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan, Areej Al-Sadhan. (Walden, Jim) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket#Electronic filing error. Summons will not be issued to DOE defendants. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan, Areej Al-Sadhan. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket#Electronic filing error. Party Ali Alzabarah has been entered on the docket. Filer is reminded to enter ALL parties as named in the Complaint. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Abdulrahman Al-Sadhan, Areej Al-Sadhan. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Summons Issued as to Ahmad Abouammo, Bader Al-Asaker, Saud Al-Qahtani, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah, Saudi Arabian Cultural Mission, Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Twitter Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2023 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/30/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Sinodis, John) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ahmad Abouammo, Bader Al-Asaker, Saud Al-Qahtani, Ahmed Almutairi, Saudi Arabian Cultural Mission, Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Twitter Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18267482.). Filed byAbdulrahman Al-Sadhan, Areej Al-Sadhan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits)(Sinodis, John) (Filed on 5/16/2023) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
[-] Read Less