This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2023 at 14:36:07 (UTC).

ZOGOVIC KAPSALIS v. COMENITY BANK et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 ZOGOVIC KAPSALIS filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against COMENITY BANK. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-20384

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TATJANA ZOGOVIC KAPSALIS

Defendants

COMENITY BANK

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

TRANSUNION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISTEN A. MORRIS

Defendant Attorney

DOROTHY A. KOWAL

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COMENITY BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14692228) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TATJANA ZOGOVIC KAPSALIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(MORRIS, KRISTEN) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #5

Summons

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMENITY BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jjc, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TATJANA ZOGOVIC KAPSALIS. COMENITY BANK waiver sent on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023; EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023; TRANSUNION, LLC waiver sent on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Service, #2 Summons Returned Executed)(MORRIS, KRISTEN) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

3 #1

Executed Waiver of Service

3 #2

Summons Returned Executed

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by DOROTHY A. KOWAL on behalf of EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. identifying Experian plc as Corporate Parent.. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint until 11/26/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/26/2023. (jal, ) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TATJANA ZOGOVIC KAPSALIS. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (MORRIS, KRISTEN) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TATJANA ZOGOVIC KAPSALIS. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (MORRIS, KRISTEN) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint until 11/26/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/26/2023. (jal, ) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. identifying Experian plc as Corporate Parent.. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by DOROTHY A. KOWAL on behalf of EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TATJANA ZOGOVIC KAPSALIS. COMENITY BANK waiver sent on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023; EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023; TRANSUNION, LLC waiver sent on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Service, #2 Summons Returned Executed)(MORRIS, KRISTEN) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMENITY BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jjc, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jjc, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against COMENITY BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14692228) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TATJANA ZOGOVIC KAPSALIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(MORRIS, KRISTEN) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less