This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/23/2023 at 07:20:12 (UTC).

Art Ask Agency v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 Art Ask Agency filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-03255

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Art Ask Agency

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Leafs Store

Nordic Art Room Store

Shop1102635425 Store

Shop1102660245 Store

Shop1102712244 Store

Shop1102717653 Store

Shop1102765204 Store

The only custom Store

134 New Brand Case Store

263 WMZJ Phone Case Store

3Cases Accessories Factory Store

3D Fshion Store Store

3D Men T Shirt Store

ABC Jewelry Store

Angell Store

Anime Phone Accessories Store

ASUDA Store

Baohui Store

126 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

Michael A. Hierl

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff's ex parte motions to extend the temporary restraining order as to Defendant Nos. 1-129 #26 #29 are granted. The temporary restraining order is extended to July 5, 2023. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#30

(#30) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Art Ask Agency as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 6/20/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

29 #2

Exhibit 2

29 #1

Exhibit 1

#29

(#29) MOTION by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendant Nos. 1-129 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#28

(#28) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/15/2023. Mailed notice. (jg, ) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

26 #2

Exhibit 2

26 #1

Exhibit 1

#26

(#26) MOTION by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendant Nos. 1-129 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Art Ask Agency (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit Group Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Art Ask Agency; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20667826. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff's ex parte motions to extend the temporary restraining order as to Defendant Nos. 1-129 #26 #29 are granted. The temporary restraining order is extended to July 5, 2023. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Shop1102676249 Store, Shop1102697482 Store, Shop1102698011 Store, Shop1102703153 Store, Shop1102716633 Store, Shop1102752661 Store, Shop1102762142 Store, Shop1102765328 Store, Shop1102770798 Store, Shop1102781136 Store, Shop1102782037 Store, Shop1102800849 Store, Shop911398026 Store, Situke Cases Store, Sixi Clothing Store, Sunny Gift Store, Tacy Home Textile Store, Tapestry House Store, Today Clothing Store, US Luxury 3D Bedding Set Store, VENDAY Official Store, Wallboard Artist Store, Wan Bao Lou Store, We Happiness2 Store, WHHW Store, Yasin Home Textiles Store, YIMEIDO Official Store, Zengjie 888 Store, ZLKYWGM Cothes Store, Dongguan Baohui Jewelry Co., Ltd., Dongguan Original Dream Jewelry Co., Ltd., Fuzhou Alidaba Trading Co., Ltd., Fuzhou Yunshang Zhilian Technology Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Muse Suppy Chain Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Zoryn Jewelry Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Hub Trading Co., Ltd., Kunshan Longlife Craft Gifts Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Nan an Yunzhan Trade Co., Ltd., Shangrao Oufeishan Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen ForceHold Industrial Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Wallesun Industrial Co., Ltd., Yiwu Guangrong Jewelry Co., Ltd., Yiwu Qinuo Jewelry Co., Ltd. and Yiwu Zhujin E-Commerce Co., Ltd. added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Junya Men T Shirt Fashion Store, Jupiter1010 Store, Jupiter1011 Store, Jupiter1012 Store, Jupiter1018 Store, Jupiter1019 Store, Jupiter1020 Store, Jupiter1023 Store, Lisa's 8996 Store, Little pudding House Managing Store, ljun202155 Store, Loves Beautiful Store, Magicals Store, Men And Kids Home Store, Micro Boutique Store, Mr JIN Store, Mr Jun Store, Mr Lin Store, MY Wonnabuy Store, MYHomelife Store, New Era Automobile Store, Norse Vikings Store, Odin Store, PanTingArt Store, Plaques Signs Store, POD Dropshipping Fashion Bags Store, Pop Home Store, qingyingyaofeng Store, RABBITRUN GYM Store, RANMO Sexy Store, Redemption Textile Store, Run To The Wind Store, SECRET BOYS Store, Shengwen Clothing Store, Shop BoYang 221025 Store, Shop1016821077 Store, Shop1100219430 Store, Shop1100266257 Store, Shop1100387285 Store, Shop1102136607 Store, Shop1102247856 Store, Shop1102301505 Store, Shop1102321449 Store, Shop1102410023 Store, Shop1102454119 Store, Shop1102488232 Store, Shop1102592117 Store, Shop1102624319 Store, Shop1102634820 Store, Shop1102636441 Store, Shop1102649632 Store and Shop1102669158 Store added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Leafs Store, Nordic Art Room Store, Shop1102635425 Store, Shop1102660245 Store, Shop1102712244 Store, Shop1102717653 Store, Shop1102765204 Store, The only custom Store, 134 New Brand Case Store, 263 WMZJ Phone Case Store, 3Cases Accessories Factory Store, 3D Fshion Store Store, 3D Men T Shirt Store, ABC Jewelry Store, Angell Store, Anime Phone Accessories Store, ASUDA Store, Baohui Store, Bauhinia Clothing Store Store, Berserker Store, BIAOLUN Boutique children Store, Bingo Clothing Store Store, bo can Store, Chinatown Dropshipping Store, Clothing Customization Factory Store Store, CO COOLEST Official Store, CUIQI Store, Custom Carpet Store, Cybill Store, Duoxiu Store, East Lucky Store, Eharlien Official Store, Falken Tire Letter Sticker Official Store, Funny Man Store Store, Funny Phone Accessories Store, FUYOOHI Funny Store, Garden Flag Store, Gelvshi Dropshipping Store Store, Gift Phone Accessories Store, Go-ahead Store, Good Shop 88888 Store, GOODGOOD888 Store, Happy1906 Store, Huayu Boutique Packaging Store, I Love Sports Store, imixlots Store, INSTANTARTS Car Accessories Store and JUHENGSHIPIN Store added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Art Ask Agency as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 6/20/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendant Nos. 1-129 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/15/2023. Mailed notice. (jg, ) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction as to Defendant Nos. 130-144 #23 is granted. Enter order. The Law Firm of Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd. is ordered to add all defendant names listed in Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto (kra, ) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendant Nos. 1-129 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, ) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, ) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Art Ask Agency (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Art Ask Agency to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Ask Agency by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Art Ask Agency; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20667826. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less