This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 10:27:29 (UTC).

KANE v. TRANSUNION

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 KANE filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against TRANSUNION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSHUA D. WOLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-03597

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSHUA D. WOLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANOA KANE

Defendant

TRANSUNION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JUSTIN T. WALTON

ANDREW HOPE

STUART R. SETTLE

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER THAT DISCOVERY IN THIS CASE IS STAYED PENDING RESOLUTION OF #13 TRANSUNION'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, IN DECIDING WHETHER TO OPPOSE THE MOTION OR TO SEEK LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, SHANOA KANE MUST CONSIDER THE ANALYSIS IN THE ORDER THAT I ISSUED TODAY GRANTING A MOTION TO DISMISS IN HER COMPANION CASE AGAINST EXPERIAN (Kane v. Experian, CASE NO. 2:23-CV-3526-JDW). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT #12 PLAINTIFF SHANOA KANE'S MOTION TO SERVE PRETRIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS UPON DEFENDANT IS DENIED IN LIGHT OF THE STAY OF DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 11/07/2023.11/07/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(ja) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

#16

(#16) ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 8, 2023 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 12B, IS CANCELED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 11/07/2023. 11/07/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(ja) Modified on 11/7/2023 (ja). (Entered: 11/07/2023)

#15

(#15) FILED IN ERROR; DUPLICATE FILING, SEE PAPER #14. (sg) Modified on 11/8/2023 (sg). (Entered: 11/07/2023)

#14

(#14) Exhibits filed by SHANOA KANE.(mbh) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

13 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - Compilation of Pro Se Complaints

13 #1

Brief

#13

(#13) First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by TRANSUNION.Motion. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Compilation of Pro Se Complaints)(HOPE, ANDREW) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

#12

(#12) SHANOA KANE MOTION TO SERVE PRETRIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS UPON DEFENDANT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE..(JL) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW HOPE on behalf of TRANSUNION with Certificate of Service(HOPE, ANDREW) (Entered: 10/26/2023)

#10

(#10) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TRANSUNION. (SETTLE, STUART) (Entered: 10/09/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 8, 2023 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 12B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/04/2023. 10/04/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(ja) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT SHALL APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/2023 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 12B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/22/2023. 9/22/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(ja) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TRANSUNION.(WALTON, JUSTIN) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF STUART R. SETTLE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/19/23.9/19/23 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(JL) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Stuart R. Settle ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16951391.) filed by TRANSUNION.Certificate of Service.(WALTON, JUSTIN) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#4

(#4) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sbt) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Trans Union Intermediate Holdings and Transunion with Certificate Of Service by TRANSUNION.(WALTON, JUSTIN) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN T. WALTON on behalf of TRANSUNION with Certificate of Service(WALTON, JUSTIN) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ORDER THAT DISCOVERY IN THIS CASE IS STAYED PENDING RESOLUTION OF #13 TRANSUNION'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, IN DECIDING WHETHER TO OPPOSE THE MOTION OR TO SEEK LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, SHANOA KANE MUST CONSIDER THE ANALYSIS IN THE ORDER THAT I ISSUED TODAY GRANTING A MOTION TO DISMISS IN HER COMPANION CASE AGAINST EXPERIAN (Kane v. Experian, CASE NO. 2:23-CV-3526-JDW). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT #12 PLAINTIFF SHANOA KANE'S MOTION TO SERVE PRETRIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS UPON DEFENDANT IS DENIED IN LIGHT OF THE STAY OF DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 11/07/2023.11/07/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(ja) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 8, 2023 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 12B, IS CANCELED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 11/07/2023. 11/07/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(ja) Modified on 11/7/2023 (ja). (Entered: 11/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) FILED IN ERROR; DUPLICATE FILING, SEE PAPER #14. (sg) Modified on 11/8/2023 (sg). (Entered: 11/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Exhibits filed by SHANOA KANE.(mbh) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by TRANSUNION.Motion. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Compilation of Pro Se Complaints)(HOPE, ANDREW) (Entered: 11/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) SHANOA KANE MOTION TO SERVE PRETRIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS UPON DEFENDANT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE..(JL) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW HOPE on behalf of TRANSUNION with Certificate of Service(HOPE, ANDREW) (Entered: 10/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TRANSUNION. (SETTLE, STUART) (Entered: 10/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 8, 2023 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 12B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/04/2023. 10/04/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(ja) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT SHALL APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/2023 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 12B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/22/2023. 9/22/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(ja) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TRANSUNION.(WALTON, JUSTIN) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF STUART R. SETTLE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/19/23.9/19/23 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(JL) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Stuart R. Settle ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16951391.) filed by TRANSUNION.Certificate of Service.(WALTON, JUSTIN) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketPro Se Guidelines Mailed Out on 9/18/23. (sbt) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sbt) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Trans Union Intermediate Holdings and Transunion with Certificate Of Service by TRANSUNION.(WALTON, JUSTIN) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN T. WALTON on behalf of TRANSUNION with Certificate of Service(WALTON, JUSTIN) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TRANSUNION (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16948104), filed by TRANSUNION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Statement Of Claim With Summons, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint To Transunion, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Case Management Track Form, #5 Designation Form)(WALTON, JUSTIN) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less