This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2023 at 08:12:08 (UTC).

Pagan-Marrero et al v. Hospital Episcopal San Lucas Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2023 Pagan-Marrero filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Hospital Episcopal San Lucas Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-01293

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raul M. Arias-Marxuach

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Glewyndaliz Leon

Myrian Pagan-Marrero

Defendants

Hospital Episcopal San Lucas Inc.

Dr. Cesar Cruz

Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico Hospitalaria

Puerto Rico Medical Defense

ABC Insurance Companies

EFG Insurance

John Doe

James Roe

Does I-X

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey M. Williams-English

Joanne J. Pimentel-De Jesus

Vanesa Vicens

Defendant Attorneys

Gloria M. De-Corral-Hernandez

Benjamin Morales-Del-Valle

Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil

Igor Dominguez-Perez

Nuyen Marrero-Bonilla

Maria T. Bustelo-Garcia

Other Attorneys

Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez

Joel Torres-Ortiz

Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas on behalf of Defendant SIMED as insurer of doctor Francisco Perez-Gil.(Ruiz-Comas, Roberto) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nuyen Marrero-Bonilla on behalf of Jose Roman-Ramos Responses due by 8/9/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marrero-Bonilla, Nuyen) Modified event type and text title on 7/28/2023 (rim). (Entered: 07/26/2023)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/26/23 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Myrian Pagan-Marrero, Guillermo Marcel Leon-Pagan, Glewyndaliz Leon filed by Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil on behalf of Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico Hospitalaria Responses due by 7/10/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Gonzalez-Villamil, Jose) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#8

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant SIMED as insurer of Dr. Javier Echevarra shall plead or otherwise defend by July 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 6/27/2023. (mrr) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Suleyka Olivero-Rivera served on 6/21/2023, answer due 7/12/2023. (Pimentel-De Jesus, Joanne) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Beazley USA Services, Inc. served on 6/15/2023, answer due 7/6/2023; Puerto Rico Medical Defense served on 6/15/2023, answer due 7/6/2023; Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico Hospitalaria served on 6/15/2023, answer due 7/6/2023. (Pimentel-De Jesus, Joanne) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne J. Pimentel-De Jesus on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pimentel-De Jesus, Joanne) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicens, Vanesa) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Beazley USA Services, Inc., Dr. Cesar Cruz, Dr. Javier Echevarria Cruz, Dr. Rafael Espinet Perez, Hospital Episcopal San Lucas Inc., Dr. Suleyka Olivero Rivera, Dr. Francisco Perez Gil, Puerto Rico Medical Defense, Dr. Isabel Rodriguez Candelario, Dr. Jose Roman Ramos, Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico Hospitalaria. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

1 #11

Summons

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Dr. Jose Roman-Ramos shall plead or otherwise defend by August 25, 2023. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/31/2023. (mrr) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas on behalf of Defendant SIMED as insurer of doctor Francisco Perez-Gil.(Ruiz-Comas, Roberto) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) ORDER granting #30 Motion for extension of time. Defendant Dr. Cesar P. Cruz-Garcia shall plead or otherwise defend by August 28, 2023. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/26/2023. (mrr) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Dr. Isabel Rodriguez-Candelario and Dr. Javier Echevarria-Cruz shall plead or otherwise defend by August 28, 2023. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/26/2023. (mrr) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) ORDER granting #28 Motion for extension of time. Defendant Hospital Episcopal San Lucas Inc. shall plead or otherwise defend by August 28, 2023. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/26/2023. (mrr) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nuyen Marrero-Bonilla on behalf of Jose Roman-Ramos Responses due by 8/9/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marrero-Bonilla, Nuyen) Modified event type and text title on 7/28/2023 (rim). (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) MOTION for extension of time until 08/25/2023 to Answer Complaint filed by Benjamin Morales-Del-Valle on behalf of Cesar Cruz Responses due by 8/9/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Del-Valle, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 25, 2023 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Myrian Pagan-Marrero, Guillermo Marcel Leon-Pagan, Glewyndaliz Leon filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of Javier Echevarria-Cruz, Isabel Rodriguez-Candelario Responses due by 8/9/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Torres-Ortiz, Joel) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) MOTION for extension of time until 8/28/2023 to to Plead filed by Gloria M. De-Corral-Hernandez on behalf of Hospital Episcopal San Lucas Inc. Responses due by 8/9/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (De-Corral-Hernandez, Gloria) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil on behalf of Defendants Suleyka Olivero-Rivera, Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico Hospitalaria.(Gonzalez-Villamil, Jose) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant SIMED as insurer of Dr. Javier Echevarra shall plead or otherwise defend by July 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 6/27/2023. (mrr) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/26/23 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Myrian Pagan-Marrero, Guillermo Marcel Leon-Pagan, Glewyndaliz Leon filed by Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil on behalf of Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico Hospitalaria Responses due by 7/10/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Gonzalez-Villamil, Jose) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Igor Dominguez-Perez on behalf of Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico Hospitalaria Responses due by 7/10/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dominguez-Perez, Igor) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Suleyka Olivero-Rivera served on 6/21/2023, answer due 7/12/2023. (Pimentel-De Jesus, Joanne) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Beazley USA Services, Inc. served on 6/15/2023, answer due 7/6/2023; Puerto Rico Medical Defense served on 6/15/2023, answer due 7/6/2023; Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico Hospitalaria served on 6/15/2023, answer due 7/6/2023. (Pimentel-De Jesus, Joanne) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne J. Pimentel-De Jesus on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pimentel-De Jesus, Joanne) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicens, Vanesa) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Beazley USA Services, Inc., Dr. Cesar Cruz, Dr. Javier Echevarria Cruz, Dr. Rafael Espinet Perez, Hospital Episcopal San Lucas Inc., Dr. Suleyka Olivero Rivera, Dr. Francisco Perez Gil, Puerto Rico Medical Defense, Dr. Isabel Rodriguez Candelario, Dr. Jose Roman Ramos, Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico Hospitalaria. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. (vdm) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8246010.), filed by Myrian Pagan Marrero, Guillermo Marcel Leon Pagan, Glewyndaliz Leon. Service due by 9/5/2023, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(Williams-English, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less