This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/14/2023 at 07:37:40 (UTC).

Williams v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2023 Williams filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne R. Traum and Craig S. Denney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00400

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anne R. Traum

Referral Judge

Craig S. Denney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas L. Williams

Malik Bey Surrell, III

Defendants

United States of America

Houston, Texas

Atlanta, Georgia

Memphis, Tennessee

Oakland, California

Memphis Police

Houston Police

Atlanta Police

OPD Oakland Police

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DRM) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

1 #1

Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

#3

(#3) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that the District Judge enter an order DISMISSING the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) WITHOUT PREJUDICE for improper venue; and DENYING the IFP application (ECF No. #1 ) AS MOOT. Objections to R&R due by 9/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 9/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#4

(#4) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(DLS) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

4 #1

Cover Letter

#5

(#5) OBJECTION to ECF No. #3 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Thomas L. Williams. Response to Objections to R&R due by 10/11/2023. (DLS) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) OBJECTION to ECF No. #3 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Thomas L. Williams. Response to Objections to R&R due by 10/11/2023. (DLS) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(DLS) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that the District Judge enter an order DISMISSING the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) WITHOUT PREJUDICE for improper venue; and DENYING the IFP application (ECF No. #1 ) AS MOOT. Objections to R&R due by 9/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 9/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DRM) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (DLS) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less