This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2023 at 08:34:21 (UTC).

Pham et al v. XL Specialty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2023 Pham filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against XL Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. Truncale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00174

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Truncale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nisa Pham

DTAM-LE 2

F/V Lucky Timmy

Defendants

XL Specialty Insurance Company

Navigators Insurance Company

Diers and Stark, Inc.

Cory Hargis

Harry Stark

Amanda Hoffman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Pat Parsons

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Myrick Browning, Jr

William Daniel Abbott

Marc J Wojciechowski

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDERED that Defendants XL Specialty Insurance Company and Navigators Insurance Companys Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time [Dkt. 16] is hereby GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand [Dkt. 11] and Motion for Award of Costs and Attorneys Fees [Dkt. 12] is August 7, 2023. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 6/6/2023. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

16 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension

#16

(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #11 MOTION to Remand by Amanda Hoffman, Navigators Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension)(Browning, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

12 #2

Text of Proposed Order

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) MOTION for Attorney Fees by Nisa Pham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Parsons, John) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

11 #3

Exhibit 3

11 #2

Exhibit 2

11 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #11

Exhibit K - Originating Court Information

1 #10

Exhibit J - List of All Counsel for All Parties

1 #8

Exhibit H - Certified Case Docket Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G - Amanda Hoffman's Executed Declaration

1 #5

Exhibit E - Removal Defendants' Answer

1 #4

Exhibit D - Forum Defendants' Answer

1 #3

Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Original Petition

1 #1

Exhibit A - Civil & Supplemental Cover Sheets

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by XL Specialty Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company from 60th Judicial District Court of Jefferson County, case number 23DCCV0159. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9481417), filed by XL Specialty Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil & Supplemental Cover Sheets, #2 Exhibit B - Index of Matters Being Filed, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #4 Exhibit D - Forum Defendants' Answer, #5 Exhibit E - Removal Defendants' Answer, #6 Exhibit F - Harry Stark's Executed Declaration, #7 Exhibit G - Amanda Hoffman's Executed Declaration, #8 Exhibit H - Certified Case Docket Sheet, #9 Exhibit I - Proof of Service, #10 Exhibit J - List of All Counsel for All Parties, #11 Exhibit K - Originating Court Information)(Abbott, William) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDERED that Defendants XL Specialty Insurance Company and Navigators Insurance Companys Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time [Dkt. 16] is hereby GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand [Dkt. 11] and Motion for Award of Costs and Attorneys Fees [Dkt. 12] is August 7, 2023. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 6/6/2023. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #11 MOTION to Remand by Amanda Hoffman, Navigators Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension)(Browning, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Nisa Pham Notice of Plaintiffs' Insurance Code Demand (Parsons, John) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Parsons, John) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Nisa Pham Plts Initial Mandatory Disclosures (Parsons, John) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Attorney Fees by Nisa Pham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Parsons, John) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Remand by Nisa Pham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Parsons, John) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Verified Plea in Abatement. This case is abated until the 60th day after pltf provides defts with written notice that complies with Texas Insurance Code 541.154. Pltf is directed to provide this notice within 14 days. The parties are directed to file a joint status report 61 days after pltf provide defts with the notice. The Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2023 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/17/23. (tkd, ) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore doc #9, Motion to Remand and for Attorney Fees. Attorney must re-file to comply with local rules regarding multi-part motions. (tkd, ) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. MOTION to Remand and Award of Costs and Attorney's Fees by Nisa Pham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Denial Letter, #2 Exhibit Insurance Investigation Report, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Report, #4 Exhibit Plt Attorney's Aff for Atty Fees, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand)(Parsons, John) Modified on 5/17/2023 (tkd, ). (Entered: 05/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed Verified Plea in Abatement by Navigators Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William D. Abbott, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting) (Abbott, William) Modified on 5/12/2023 (tkd, ). (Entered: 05/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) attorney conference by 5/23/2023. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2023 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 5/9/23. (tkd, ) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, ) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (tkd, ) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc J Wojciechowski on behalf of Diers and Stark, Inc., Cory Hargis, Harry Stark (Wojciechowski, Marc) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORIGINAL ANSWER (Filed in State Court) to #3 Original Petition, filed by Amanda Hoffman, Navigators Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company.(tkd, ) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORIGINAL ANSWER (Filed in State Court) to #3 Original Petition, filed by Diers and Stark, Inc., Cory Hargis, Harry Stark.(tkd, ) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORIGINAL PETITION (Filed in State Court) against Diers and Stark, Inc., Cory Hargis, Amanda Hoffman, Navigators Insurance Company, Harry Stark, XL Specialty Insurance Company, filed by F/V Lucky Timmy, DTAM-LE 2, Nisa Pham.(tkd, ) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by DTAM-LE 2, F/V Lucky Timmy, Nisa Pham. (tkd, ) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by XL Specialty Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company from 60th Judicial District Court of Jefferson County, case number 23DCCV0159. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9481417), filed by XL Specialty Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil & Supplemental Cover Sheets, #2 Exhibit B - Index of Matters Being Filed, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #4 Exhibit D - Forum Defendants' Answer, #5 Exhibit E - Removal Defendants' Answer, #6 Exhibit F - Harry Stark's Executed Declaration, #7 Exhibit G - Amanda Hoffman's Executed Declaration, #8 Exhibit H - Certified Case Docket Sheet, #9 Exhibit I - Proof of Service, #10 Exhibit J - List of All Counsel for All Parties, #11 Exhibit K - Originating Court Information)(Abbott, William) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less