This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/23/2023 at 08:41:45 (UTC).

Westland Snacks and Fuel LLC v. Technology Insurance Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/24/2023 Westland Snacks and Fuel LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Technology Insurance Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Judith E. Levy and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-10944

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Judith E. Levy

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westland Snacks and Fuel LLC

Defendant

Technology Insurance Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cyril C. Hall

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole E. Wilinski

Hannah Rose Brefeld

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Technology Insurance Company, Inc. (Wilinski, Nicole) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Hannah Rose Brefeld appearing on behalf of All Defendants Technology Insurance Company, Inc. (Brefeld, Hannah) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

#5

(#5) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Wilinski, Nicole) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/8/2023 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/12/2024 Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2024 10:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Jury Trial set for 7/29/2024 08:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Refer to image for additional dates) (WBar) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/8/2023 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/12/2024 Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2024 10:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Jury Trial set for 7/29/2024 08:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Refer to image for additional dates) (WBar) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Wilinski, Nicole) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Hannah Rose Brefeld appearing on behalf of All Defendants Technology Insurance Company, Inc. (Brefeld, Hannah) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER: The parties are ordered to review Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 26(f) and FILE a Joint Discovery Plan with the Court in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 26(f)(3), on or before 6/5/2023. The Court will review the plan and determine whether to set a scheduling conference or enter a scheduling order based upon the filed plan. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wilinski, Nicole) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SSch) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Technology Insurance Company, Inc. (Wilinski, Nicole) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Technology Insurance Company, Inc. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 23-003591-CK. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9322625 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Wilinski, Nicole) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less