This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/18/2023 at 19:19:58 (UTC).

Amparo v. Akhmetov et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2023 Amparo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Akhmetov. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael P. Shea and Thomas O. Farrish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00493

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Shea

Referral Judge

Thomas O. Farrish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edith Amparo

Defendants

Yerlan Akhmetov

SEKA Moving Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael D'Amico

Thomas P. Pettinicchi

Defendant Attorney

Michael P. Kenney

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2023, Discovery due by 8/1/2024, Trial Brief due by 9/16/2024, Jury Selection date is November 6, 2024. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 5/31/23.(Wood, R.) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#19

(#19) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas O. Farrish: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 5/31/2023. Time 12 minutes(Court Reporter Court Smart.) (Wood, R.) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#16

(#16) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pettinicchi, Thomas) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Pettinicchi on behalf of Edith Amparo (Pettinicchi, Thomas) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#13

(#13) First MOTION for Garrett M. Moore, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney by Edith Amparo. (Moore, Garrett) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D'Amico on behalf of Edith Amparo in lieu of Garrett Moore (D'Amico, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation Notice of no Pending Motions (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

8 #1

Standing Order on Removed Cases

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by SEKA Moving Corporation, #7 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

#6

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by SEKA Moving Corporation, #7 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

#5

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by SEKA Moving Corporation, #7 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

#3

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by SEKA Moving Corporation, #7 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

#2

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by SEKA Moving Corporation, #7 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of Removal filed in State Court

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Summons

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2023, Discovery due by 8/1/2024, Trial Brief due by 9/16/2024, Jury Selection date is November 6, 2024. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 5/31/23.(Wood, R.) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas O. Farrish: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 5/31/2023. Time 12 minutes(Court Reporter Court Smart.) (Wood, R.) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

Docket(#18) NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 5/31/2023 at 1:00 PM before Judge Thomas O. Farrish. Please call in to the Court's conference call line at 1-888-557-8511 and enter the pass code of 4478772# when prompted. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ORDER. The parties have filed their #16 Rule 26(f) report. This case is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Farrish to hold a Rule 16 conference and enter a scheduling order. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/23/2023. (Britt, Joshua) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pettinicchi, Thomas) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Pettinicchi on behalf of Edith Amparo (Pettinicchi, Thomas) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER. The #13 motion for Garrett M. Moore, Esq. to withdraw as attorney is GRANTED.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/26/2023. (Britt, Joshua) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) First MOTION for Garrett M. Moore, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney by Edith Amparo. (Moore, Garrett) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D'Amico on behalf of Edith Amparo in lieu of Garrett Moore (D'Amico, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation Notice of no Pending Motions (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
04/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D'Amico on behalf of Edith Amparo in lieu of Garrett Moore (D'Amico, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by SEKA Moving Corporation, #7 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/19/2023. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/19/2023. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/18/2023. Discovery due by 10/19/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 11/23/2023. Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2023. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

DocketJudge Michael P. Shea and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

Docket(#4) Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2023.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement by SEKA Moving Corporation. (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kenney on behalf of Yerlan Akhmetov, SEKA Moving Corporation (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SEKA Moving Corporation, Yerlan Akhmetov from Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of New Haven at New Haven, case number NNH-CV23-6131850-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7317581, filed by SEKA Moving Corporation, Yerlan Akhmetov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal filed in State Court)(Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less