This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2023 at 08:03:22 (UTC).

Becker v. G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 Becker filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Derek T. Gilliland and Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00357

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Derek T. Gilliland

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyler Becker

Defendant

G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Clifton Alexander

Alan Clifton Gordon

Austin W. Anderson

Lauren E. Braddy

Carter T. Hastings

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17440917), filed by Tyler Becker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Tyler Becker. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tyler Becker as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. Waiver sent on 5/19/2023, answer due 7/18/2023. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated Standing Orders: #Order Regarding Court Docket Management and #Amended Standing Order for Pretrial Procedure. Both orders are available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot2) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tyler Becker as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. Waiver sent on 5/19/2023, answer due 7/18/2023. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions USA Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ad3) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Tyler Becker. (Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17440917), filed by Tyler Becker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less