This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2023 at 10:03:28 (UTC).

Palmer v. Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 Palmer filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Ray, II and Walter E. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00198

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

Referral Judge

Walter E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Thomas Palmer

Defendants

Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation doing business as Adventhealth Gordon

Laverne Keizer

Lishcia Keizer

William David Brannon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward D. Buckley

Joseph Quattlebaum

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley E. Strawn

Lauren E.L. Tilashalski

Eric K. Smith

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum by William David Brannon, Laverne Keizer, Lishcia Keizer.(Smith, Eric) (Entered: 10/23/2023)

#22

(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by James Thomas Palmer.(Quattlebaum, Joseph) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#21

(#21) NOTICE to Parties Regarding Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 10/18/23. (klb) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#20

(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #18 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. As an initial matter, the undersigned observes that mediation could be successful here, given the parties' indication that there is a possibility of settlement. The Court offers the services of its Magistrate Judges to mediate cases at no cost. Should the parties desire to mediate, they may contact the chambers of the Honorable Russell G. Vineyard (404-215-1375), Chief United States Magistrate Judge. Discovery ends on 2/15/2024. Motions under Local Rule 7.1(A)(2) including motions to amend pleadings due by 11/17/2023. Motions for summary judgment no later than 3/18/24. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2024, or within thirty days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims advanced by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 10/18/23. (klb) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Initial Disclosures by Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation.(Strawn, Bradley) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#18

(#18) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by James Thomas Palmer. (Quattlebaum, Joseph) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Requests for Production by William David Brannon.(Smith, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Set of Interrogatories by William David Brannon.(Smith, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Requests for Production by Laverne Keizer.(Smith, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by James Thomas Palmer. (Buckley, Edward) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by William David Brannon, Laverne Keizer, Lishcia Keizer. (Smith, Eric) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation. (Strawn, Bradley) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D-Notice of State Court Filing Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit C-Amended Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B-Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A-Case Docket and Pleadings

#1

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation.(Strawn, Bradley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/18/2023)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum by William David Brannon, Laverne Keizer, Lishcia Keizer.(Smith, Eric) (Entered: 10/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by James Thomas Palmer.(Quattlebaum, Joseph) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) NOTICE to Parties Regarding Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 10/18/23. (klb) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #18 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. As an initial matter, the undersigned observes that mediation could be successful here, given the parties' indication that there is a possibility of settlement. The Court offers the services of its Magistrate Judges to mediate cases at no cost. Should the parties desire to mediate, they may contact the chambers of the Honorable Russell G. Vineyard (404-215-1375), Chief United States Magistrate Judge. Discovery ends on 2/15/2024. Motions under Local Rule 7.1(A)(2) including motions to amend pleadings due by 11/17/2023. Motions for summary judgment no later than 3/18/24. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2024, or within thirty days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims advanced by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 10/18/23. (klb) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Initial Disclosures by Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation.(Strawn, Bradley) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by James Thomas Palmer. (Quattlebaum, Joseph) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Requests for Production by William David Brannon.(Smith, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Set of Interrogatories by William David Brannon.(Smith, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Requests for Production by Laverne Keizer.(Smith, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Set of Interrogatories by Laverne Keizer.(Smith, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Initial Disclosures by Laverne Keizer.(Smith, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Initial Disclosures by Lishcia Keizer.(Smith, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation.(Strawn, Bradley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Am. Complaint - Dkt. # 1-3) by William David Brannon.(Smith, Eric) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Am. Complaint - Dkt. # 1-3) by Laverne Keizer.(Smith, Eric) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Am. Complaint - Dkt. # 1-3) by Lishcia Keizer. Discovery ends on 2/15/2024.(Smith, Eric) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by James Thomas Palmer. (Buckley, Edward) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by William David Brannon, Laverne Keizer, Lishcia Keizer. (Smith, Eric) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation. (Strawn, Bradley) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Laverne Keizer, Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation, Lishcia Keizer, William David Brannon. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12875587) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Case Docket and Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D-Notice of State Court Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less