This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/07/2023 at 07:53:12 (UTC).

ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc. et al v. Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00201

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc.

ADVA Optical Networking SE

Defendant

Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Folks

Samuel Franklin Baxter

Jennifer Leigh Truelove

Elizabeth Bernard

John Stewart Holley

Blair M Jacobs

Arvind Jairam

Christina Ann Ondrick

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

(#20) Unopposed MOTION TO SET TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

19 #1

Affidavit/Declaration

#19

(#19) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on Authorized Agents on 5/30/2023, filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit/Declaration)(Jacobs, Blair) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

18 #3

Affidavit/Declaration

18 #2

Affidavit/Declaration

18 #1

Affidavit/Declaration

#18

(#18) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on Registered and Authorized Agents on 5/23/2023, filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit/Declaration, #2 Affidavit/Declaration, #3 Affidavit/Declaration)(Jacobs, Blair) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

17 #5

Additional Attachment(s)

#2

(#2) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE (Jacobs, Blair) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd., filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) Unopposed MOTION TO SET TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on Authorized Agents on 5/30/2023, filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit/Declaration)(Jacobs, Blair) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on Registered and Authorized Agents on 5/23/2023, filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit/Declaration, #2 Affidavit/Declaration, #3 Affidavit/Declaration)(Jacobs, Blair) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) SUMMONS Issued as to Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.. (registered agents and various addresses) (Attachments: #1 Additional Attachment(s), #2 Additional Attachment(s), #3 Additional Attachment(s), #4 Additional Attachment(s), #5 Additional Attachment(s), #6 Additional Attachment(s))(nkl, ) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd., filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Jacobs, Blair) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) SUMMONS Issued as to Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.. (registered agents and various addresses) (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Registered Agent on 5/18/2023, filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. (Jacobs, Blair) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Registered Agent on 5/18/2023, filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. (Jacobs, Blair) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) SUMMONS Issued as to Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.. Registered Agents for Huawei (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Bernard on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bernard, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arvind Jairam on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jairam, Arvind) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Ann Ondrick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ondrick, Christina) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Stewart Holley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Holley, John) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Jacobs, Blair) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE (Jacobs, Blair) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd., filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less