This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/23/2023 at 07:20:49 (UTC).

Syse v. Home Depot, U.S.A Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 Syse filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot, U S A Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmond E. Chang and Beth W. Jantz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-03257

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

Referral Judge

Beth W. Jantz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rush Syse

Defendant

Home Depot, U.S.A Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Craig Sklare

Robert K Leyshon

Defendant Attorney

Noel Basil Haberek, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) AGREED Confidentiality Order. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 7/14/2023. Mailed notice. (as, ) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#13

(#13) Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.'s ANSWER to amended complaint At Law by Home Depot, U.S.A Inc.(Haberek, Noel) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

#12

(#12) AMENDED complaint by Rush Syse against Rush Syse (Leyshon, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Rush Syse (Leyshon, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Jantz for discovery supervision #8 #9 . The Court sets the following deadlines: Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures to be made by 7/14/23; Written discovery requests to be issued by 8/1/23; and Fact discovery to be completed by 2/19/24. Additionally, the parties requested entry of an agreed Qualified Protective Order in their joint status report #7 ; they are to submit by 7/14/23 a Word version of that proposed order (along with a redline to the Court's model order, if there are any proposed changes) to this Court's Proposed Order Inbox (Proposed_Order_Jantz@ilnd.uscourts.gov). A telephonic initial status conference is scheduled for 9/6/23 at 10:30 a.m. To join the status conference by phone, counsel shall dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing as well. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (as, ) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#9

(#9) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Beth W. Jantz for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision (including the authority to adjust all deadlines). (mw, ) Emailed notice. (Entered: 06/15/2023)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the status report, R. 7, the Plaintiff shall file (without objection) the amended complaint naming the correct Home Depot entity by 06/20/2023. The Court assumes that the newly named Defendant will accept service without further ado. The answer deadline is set for 07/18/2023. Discovery supervision is referred to the magistrate judge (including the authority to adjust all deadlines). The tracking status hearing of 06/16/2023 is reset to 08/18/2023 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Rush Syse (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leyshon, Robert) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

6 #1

Status Report Requirements

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial tracking status hearing set for 06/16/2023 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 06/08/2023. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If Defendant has not been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#5

(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsels of record. (jk2, ) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#4

(#4) FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Home Depot, U.S.A Inc. FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Haberek, Noel) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Home Depot, U.S.A Inc. by Noel Basil Haberek, Jr Appearance of Noel B. Haberek (Haberek, Noel) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Haberek, Noel) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Law Division, case number (2023L003995) filed by HOME DEPOT U.S. A. INC, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20668025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Haberek, Noel) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AGREED Confidentiality Order. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 7/14/2023. Mailed notice. (as, ) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.'s ANSWER to amended complaint At Law by Home Depot, U.S.A Inc.(Haberek, Noel) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED complaint by Rush Syse against Rush Syse (Leyshon, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Rush Syse (Leyshon, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Jantz for discovery supervision #8 #9 . The Court sets the following deadlines: Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures to be made by 7/14/23; Written discovery requests to be issued by 8/1/23; and Fact discovery to be completed by 2/19/24. Additionally, the parties requested entry of an agreed Qualified Protective Order in their joint status report #7 ; they are to submit by 7/14/23 a Word version of that proposed order (along with a redline to the Court's model order, if there are any proposed changes) to this Court's Proposed Order Inbox (Proposed_Order_Jantz@ilnd.uscourts.gov). A telephonic initial status conference is scheduled for 9/6/23 at 10:30 a.m. To join the status conference by phone, counsel shall dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing as well. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (as, ) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Beth W. Jantz for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision (including the authority to adjust all deadlines). (mw, ) Emailed notice. (Entered: 06/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the status report, R. 7, the Plaintiff shall file (without objection) the amended complaint naming the correct Home Depot entity by 06/20/2023. The Court assumes that the newly named Defendant will accept service without further ado. The answer deadline is set for 07/18/2023. Discovery supervision is referred to the magistrate judge (including the authority to adjust all deadlines). The tracking status hearing of 06/16/2023 is reset to 08/18/2023 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Rush Syse (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leyshon, Robert) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial tracking status hearing set for 06/16/2023 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 06/08/2023. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If Defendant has not been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, ) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsels of record. (jk2, ) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, ) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Home Depot, U.S.A Inc. FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Haberek, Noel) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Home Depot, U.S.A Inc. by Noel Basil Haberek, Jr Appearance of Noel B. Haberek (Haberek, Noel) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Haberek, Noel) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Law Division, case number (2023L003995) filed by HOME DEPOT U.S. A. INC, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20668025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Haberek, Noel) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less