This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2023 at 07:44:27 (UTC).

Wilson v. United Parcel Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 Wilson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against United Parcel Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy J. Corrigan and Laura Lothman Lambert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00544

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

Referral Judge

Laura Lothman Lambert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Wilson

Defendant

United Parcel Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas A. Delegal, III

James C. Poindexter

Alexandra Elizabeth Underkofler

Defendant Attorney

Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Charles Wilson. (Poindexter, James) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to United Parcel Service, Inc. (BD) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service Executed on 5/10/2023 as to United Parcel Service, Inc. by Charles Wilson (Poindexter, James) Modified text on 5/17/2023 (BD). (Entered: 05/16/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul on behalf of United Parcel Service, Inc. (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to #1 Complaint by United Parcel Service, Inc. (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. Modified text on 5/19/2023 (BD). (Entered: 05/18/2023)

#10

(#10) CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. Modified on 6/15/2023 to edit text (AET). (Entered: 06/14/2023)

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Parcel Service, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Charles Wilson. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Charles Wilson.(Poindexter, James) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

#13

(#13) United Parcel Service, Inc.'s ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #12 Amended Complaint by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

 

Docket Entries

06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) United Parcel Service, Inc.'s ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #12 Amended Complaint by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Parcel Service, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Charles Wilson. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Charles Wilson.(Poindexter, James) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ENDORSED ORDER granting #10, the parties' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint on or before June 16, 2023; and defendant shall file its response on or before June 30, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 6/16/2023. (REL) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. Modified on 6/15/2023 to edit text (AET). (Entered: 06/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's brief is due on or before June 14, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 5/22/2023. (NK) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to #1 Complaint by United Parcel Service, Inc. (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. Modified text on 5/19/2023 (BD). (Entered: 05/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul on behalf of United Parcel Service, Inc. (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) RETURN of Service Executed on 5/10/2023 as to United Parcel Service, Inc. by Charles Wilson (Poindexter, James) Modified text on 5/17/2023 (BD). (Entered: 05/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to United Parcel Service, Inc. (BD) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Charles Wilson. (Poindexter, James) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KKH) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:23-cv-544-TJC-LLL. (AM) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United Parcel Service, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20804349) filed by Charles F. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Poindexter, James) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less