This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2023 at 08:02:07 (UTC).

Solis, Jr. et al v. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2023 Solis, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gordon P Gallagher and N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01119

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon P Gallagher

Referral Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andrew Solis, Jr.

Christina Solis

Defendant

Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Edward D'Angelo

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel Truman Jennings

Katie Berit Johnson

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2023CV30245. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9081912), filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Jennings, Rachel) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #8

Exhibit G

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Jennings, Rachel) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katie Berit Johnson on behalf of Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.Attorney Katie Berit Johnson added to party Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.(pty:dft) (Johnson, Katie) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., filed by Andrew Solis, Jr., Christina Solis.(norlin, ) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet upon Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. on 4/12/2023 (norlin, ) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Edward D'Angelo on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Daniel Edward D'Angelo added to party Christina Solis(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Edward D'Angelo added to party Andrew Solis, Jr. (pty:pla) (D'Angelo, Daniel) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#12

(#12) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 5 May 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/16/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

#11

(#11) Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc..(Jennings, Rachel) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc..(Jennings, Rachel) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 5 May 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/16/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/4/2023. Text Only Entry (sdunb, ) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Edward D'Angelo on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Daniel Edward D'Angelo added to party Christina Solis(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Edward D'Angelo added to party Andrew Solis, Jr. (pty:pla) (D'Angelo, Daniel) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet upon Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. on 4/12/2023 (norlin, ) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., filed by Andrew Solis, Jr., Christina Solis.(norlin, ) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katie Berit Johnson on behalf of Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.Attorney Katie Berit Johnson added to party Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.(pty:dft) (Johnson, Katie) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Jennings, Rachel) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2023CV30245. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9081912), filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Jennings, Rachel) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less