This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2023 at 07:44:52 (UTC).

Lash v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 Lash filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Sanofi US Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01761

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherry Lash

Defendants

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Sandoz, Inc.

Hospira, Inc.

Pfizer, Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Hospira Worldwide, LLC

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.

Hospira Worldwide, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard M. Paul, III

Justin Edward Dunlap

Karen Cannon Shanks

Patrick O'Connor Hotze

Laura Fellows

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Hospira Worldwide, LLC f/k/a Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9953200) filed by Sherry Lash. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)Attorney Richard M. Paul, III added to party Sherry Lash(pty:pla).(Paul, Richard) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #7

Summons

#2

(#2) Notice of Designated Forum - Northern District of Mississippi by Sherry Lash re #1 Complaint, . (Paul, Richard) Modified on 5/30/2023 (am). (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (am) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#5

(#5) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(my) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(my) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (am) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Designated Forum - Northern District of Mississippi by Sherry Lash re #1 Complaint, . (Paul, Richard) Modified on 5/30/2023 (am). (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Hospira Worldwide, LLC f/k/a Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9953200) filed by Sherry Lash. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)Attorney Richard M. Paul, III added to party Sherry Lash(pty:pla).(Paul, Richard) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less